This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/13/2022 at 03:05:46 (UTC).

TYRONE CANADY VS COASTLINE RECOVERY SERVICES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/14/2021 TYRONE CANADY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against COASTLINE RECOVERY SERVICES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7918

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CANADY TYRONE

Cross Defendants and Defendants

COASTLINE RECOVERY SERVICES INC.

PRIMERITUS FINANCIAL SERVICES INC.

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

PRIMERITUS FINANCIAL SERVICES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAMIDEH BELAL GHALEB

Cross Defendant Attorney

TIBERI PHILLIP V.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

7/18/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

Cross-Complaint

1/11/2022: Cross-Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/11/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

1/11/2022: Answer

Request for Dismissal

2/2/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/4/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

2/4/2022: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

2/4/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Substitution of Attorney

2/7/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/13/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

12/13/2021: Proof of Personal Service

PI General Order

11/4/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Demand for Jury Trial

10/14/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/14/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

10/14/2021: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2024
  • Hearing10/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • Hearing04/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • Hearing03/30/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketNotice (OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL); Filed by COASTLINE RECOVERY SERVICES, INC. (Defendant); PRIMERITUS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by PRIMERITUS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by COASTLINE RECOVERY SERVICES, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by COASTLINE RECOVERY SERVICES, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by COASTLINE RECOVERY SERVICES, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by PRIMERITUS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by PRIMERITUS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by PRIMERITUS FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Tyrone Canady (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Tyrone Canady (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Tyrone Canady (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Tyrone Canady (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Tyrone Canady (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Tyrone Canady (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRIMERITUS FINANCIAL SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where COASTLINE RECOVERY SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TIBERI PHILLIP V.