This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/26/2019 at 03:04:40 (UTC).

TYRONE A MORRISON VS TIMOTHY G MUNYER ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/05/2017 TYRONE A MORRISON filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against TIMOTHY G MUNYER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT L. HESS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6703

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT L. HESS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MORRISON TYRONE A.

Respondents and Defendants

MUNYER TIMOTHY G.

THE ESTATE OF HERBERT DUFFUS

DOES 1 TO 10

JAMISON DON

JAMISON DONALD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

AUSTIN L. BISHOP ESQ.

AUSTIN LEROY BISHOP

Defendant Attorney

SCHILLER MICHAEL I

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

2/15/2018: Minute Order

APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

3/27/2018: APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. DECLARATORY RELIEF; ETC.

4/6/2018: ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. DECLARATORY RELIEF; ETC.

NOTICE OF REJECTION APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

4/9/2018: NOTICE OF REJECTION APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

PROOF OF SERVICE 1ST AMENDED S&C

4/10/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE 1ST AMENDED S&C

Minute Order

5/17/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

6/21/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

NOTICE OF HEARING- CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/9/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING- CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION - DON JAMISON

8/9/2018: NOTICE OF DEPOSITION - DON JAMISON

PROOF OF SERVICE-TIMOTHY 0. MUNYER BY DEPUTY SHERIFF KEITH R. WILLIAMS

8/9/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE-TIMOTHY 0. MUNYER BY DEPUTY SHERIFF KEITH R. WILLIAMS

Minute Order

8/17/2018: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY REGARDING MEET AND CONFER

8/31/2018: DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY REGARDING MEET AND CONFER

DEFENDANT, TIMOTHY MUNYER'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

8/31/2018: DEFENDANT, TIMOTHY MUNYER'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

DEFENDANT, TIMOTHY MUNYER'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/31/2018: DEFENDANT, TIMOTHY MUNYER'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Unknown

11/8/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

11/14/2017: Minute Order

VERWIED COMPLAINT FOR 1. DECLARATORY RELIEF; ETC.

4/5/2017: VERWIED COMPLAINT FOR 1. DECLARATORY RELIEF; ETC.

SUMMONS

4/5/2017: SUMMONS

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Expunge Lis Pendens and Award Attorney Fees) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Expunge Lis Pendens and Aw...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketOrder (proposed ORDER to Expunge Lis Pendens & Award of Attorney Fees); Filed by Timothy G. Munyer (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (to Expunge Lis Pendens and Award Attorney Fees); Filed by Timothy G. Munyer (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketNotice ( of Entry of Order); Filed by Timothy G. Munyer (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Timothy G. Munyer (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketDeclaration ( of Timonthy Munyer in Support of Ex-Parte Application); Filed by Timothy G. Munyer (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketNotice (Declaration of Ex-Parte Notice); Filed by Timothy G. Munyer (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by Timothy G. Munyer (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by Timothy G. Munyer (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
79 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • DocketFIRST AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. DECLARATORY RELIEF 2. QUIET TITLE ; ETC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Tyrone A. Morrison (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • DocketFIRST AMENDED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR: 1. DECLARATORY RELIEF; ETC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Tyrone A. Morrison (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketVERWIED COMPLAINT FOR 1. DECLARATORY RELIEF; ETC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****6703    Hearing Date: August 18, 2020    Dept: 24

Plaintiff’s default judgment application is DENIED without prejudice.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AUSTIN L. BISHOP