Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2021 at 02:54:33 (UTC).

TYRESE LEE EVANS JR., ET AL. VS ANA DEL ROSARIO FLORES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 TYRESE LEE EVANS JR filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ANA DEL ROSARIO FLORES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4023

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MERAZ HENICY ARGENTINA

BLACKWOOD YOLANDA

EVANS JR. TYRESE LEE

Defendants

FLORES CYNTHIA

FLORES ANA DEL ROSARIO

FLORES JR. MIGUEL ANGEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RILEY GRANT KEVIN

SHAKHNIS PHILIP

MITCHELTREE TARA

 

Court Documents

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR SIRE

5/4/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR SIRE

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR AUTUMN

5/4/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR AUTUMN

Notice of Change of Firm Name

5/13/2021: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR AYDIN

4/19/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR AYDIN

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/16/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/13/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • Hearing08/25/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 73 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Tyrese Lee Evans Jr. (Plaintiff); Aydin Noel Evans (Plaintiff); Sire Lee Nathan Evans, a minor, by and through her guardian ad litem, Tyrese Lee Evans Jr. (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Tyrese Lee Evans Jr. (Plaintiff); Aydin Noel Evans (Plaintiff); Sire Lee Nathan Evans, a minor, by and through her guardian ad litem, Tyrese Lee Evans Jr. (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Autumn); Filed by Tyrese Lee Evans Jr. (Plaintiff); Aydin Noel Evans (Plaintiff); Sire Lee Nathan Evans, a minor, by and through her guardian ad litem, Tyrese Lee Evans Jr. (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Sire); Filed by Tyrese Lee Evans Jr. (Plaintiff); Aydin Noel Evans (Plaintiff); Sire Lee Nathan Evans, a minor, by and through her guardian ad litem, Tyrese Lee Evans Jr. (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Aydin); Filed by Tyrese Lee Evans Jr. (Plaintiff); Aydin Noel Evans (Plaintiff); Sire Lee Nathan Evans, a minor, by and through her guardian ad litem, Tyrese Lee Evans Jr. (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Tyrese Lee Evans Jr. (Plaintiff); Aydin Noel Evans (Plaintiff); Sire Lee Nathan Evans, a minor, by and through her guardian ad litem, Tyrese Lee Evans Jr. (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Tyrese Lee Evans Jr. (Plaintiff); Aydin Noel Evans (Plaintiff); Sire Lee Nathan Evans, a minor, by and through her guardian ad litem, Tyrese Lee Evans Jr. (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MITCHELTREE TARA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RILEY GRANT K.