This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/26/2023 at 14:35:12 (UTC).

TYMESHA COLEMAN ABRAHAM, ET AL. VS GOLDEN OPPORTUNITY INVESTMENTS, LP,, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/20/2022 TYMESHA COLEMAN ABRAHAM, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GOLDEN OPPORTUNITY INVESTMENTS, LP,,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1460

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ABRAHAM ALBERT

ABRAHAM TYMESHA COLEMAN

ALATORRE BRIAN

ALATORRE JESSE

ATKINS MARGARET

AUSTIN LARONDA

AUSTIN LATRES MARGARET

BURTON JOHN

ESPINO BRAULIO GARCIA

ESPINO MARIA DEL CARMEN

HARRIS SANDRA

HARRIS STEVEN II

MANN SOMNEANG

PENSAMIENTO DAMIAN

PEREZ AMALIA

RICHARDSON ANTHONY

RICHARDSON DARRYL

Defendants

BRIDGE MANAGEMENT INC.

GOLDEN OPPORTUNITY INVESTMENTS INC.

GOLDEN OPPORTUNITY INVESTMENTS LP

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STROM ROBB M.

Defendant Attorneys

YEE STEVEN R.

GOLDBERG KAREN B.

FOLEY PATRICK J.

CARPENTER GREGORY J.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

3/3/2023: Notice of Ruling

Order - ORDER REGARDING FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL PROCEDURE

3/2/2023: Order - ORDER REGARDING FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL PROCEDURE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE OF PLAINTIFFS, DAVID C...)

3/2/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE OF PLAINTIFFS, DAVID C...)

Order - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

3/2/2023: Order - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER; ORDER REGARDING FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL PROCEDURE

3/2/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER; ORDER REGARDING FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL PROCEDURE

Reply - REPLY REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE

2/23/2023: Reply - REPLY REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE

Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

2/22/2023: Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE; DECLARATION OF WILLIAM G. SORKIN

2/16/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE; DECLARATION OF WILLIAM G. SORKIN

Objection - OBJECTION TO THE DECLARATION OF ROBB STROM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE

2/16/2023: Objection - OBJECTION TO THE DECLARATION OF ROBB STROM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE

Objection - OBJECTION TO THE DECLARATION OF JEFFREY HIRSCH, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE

2/16/2023: Objection - OBJECTION TO THE DECLARATION OF JEFFREY HIRSCH, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

2/6/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Motion for Trial Preference

2/1/2023: Motion for Trial Preference

Case Management Statement

1/26/2023: Case Management Statement

Association of Attorney

12/28/2022: Association of Attorney

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: ADVANCING AND CONTINUING THE CASE MANAGEMENT ...) OF 12/15/2022

12/15/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: ADVANCING AND CONTINUING THE CASE MANAGEMENT ...) OF 12/15/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: ADVANCING AND CONTINUING THE CASE MANAGEMENT ...)

12/15/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: ADVANCING AND CONTINUING THE CASE MANAGEMENT ...)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/30/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Association of Attorney

11/30/2022: Association of Attorney

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2023
  • Hearing08/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 76 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2023
  • Hearing07/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 76 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • Hearing05/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 76 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted Set One, to Plaintiff Tymesha Coleman Abraham Admitted; Motion for Monetary Sanctions Against Plaintiff and her Counsel of Record Storm & Associates, APC, Jointly and Severally, in the Amount of $1,390 [Res. ID# 262295496918] scheduled for 03/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 76 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 03/15/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketPost-Mediation Status Conference scheduled for 05/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 76

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 07/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 76

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 08/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 76

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketOrder Regarding Final Status Conference and Trial Procedure; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion for Trial Preference [Res. ID #0673]: Name Extension: [Res. ID #0673] ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Trial Preference; Declaration of William G. Sorkin [Res. ID #0673]: Name Extension changed from DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE; DECLARATION OF WILLIAM G. SORKIN to to Plaintiffs' Motion for Trial Preference; Declaration of William G. Sorkin [Res. ID #0673] ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
81 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing: As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet: As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case: As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Tymesha Coleman Abraham (Plaintiff); Albert Abraham (Plaintiff); Samuel Weatherspoon (Plaintiff); Latres Margaret Austin (Plaintiff); Laronda Austin (Plaintiff); David Chism (Plaintiff); Jayden Chism (Plaintiff); Jaylen Chism (Plaintiff); Jorden Chism (Plaintiff); Larissa Chism (Plaintiff); Margaret Atkins (Plaintiff); Amalia Perez (Plaintiff); Brian Alatorre (Plaintiff); Jesse Alatorre (Plaintiff); Sandra Harris (Plaintiff); Steven Harris, II (Plaintiff); Damian Pensamiento (Plaintiff); Lucy Vasquez (Plaintiff); Santiago Martinez (Plaintiff); Mary Calderon (Plaintiff); Alyssa Pensamiento (Plaintiff); John Burton (Plaintiff); Tatiana Willliams (Plaintiff); John Burton, Jr. (Plaintiff); Jaylen Williams (Plaintiff); Anthony Richardson (Plaintiff); Darryl Richardson (Plaintiff); Darryl Richardson, Jr. (Plaintiff); Cynthia Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Luna Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Maria Del Carmen Espino (Plaintiff); Braulio Garcia Espino (Plaintiff); Somneang Man

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Tymesha Coleman Abraham (Plaintiff); Albert Abraham (Plaintiff); Samuel Weatherspoon (Plaintiff); Latres Margaret Austin (Plaintiff); Laronda Austin (Plaintiff); David Chism (Plaintiff); Jayden Chism (Plaintiff); Jaylen Chism (Plaintiff); Jorden Chism (Plaintiff); Larissa Chism (Plaintiff); Margaret Atkins (Plaintiff); Amalia Perez (Plaintiff); Brian Alatorre (Plaintiff); Jesse Alatorre (Plaintiff); Sandra Harris (Plaintiff); Steven Harris, II (Plaintiff); Damian Pensamiento (Plaintiff); Lucy Vasquez (Plaintiff); Santiago Martinez (Plaintiff); Mary Calderon (Plaintiff); Alyssa Pensamiento (Plaintiff); John Burton (Plaintiff); Tatiana Willliams (Plaintiff); John Burton, Jr. (Plaintiff); Jaylen Williams (Plaintiff); Anthony Richardson (Plaintiff); Darryl Richardson (Plaintiff); Darryl Richardson, Jr. (Plaintiff); Cynthia Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Luna Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Maria Del Carmen Espino (Plaintiff); Braulio Garcia Espino (Plaintiff); Somneang Man

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Tymesha Coleman Abraham (Plaintiff); Albert Abraham (Plaintiff); Samuel Weatherspoon (Plaintiff); Latres Margaret Austin (Plaintiff); Laronda Austin (Plaintiff); David Chism (Plaintiff); Jayden Chism (Plaintiff); Jaylen Chism (Plaintiff); Jorden Chism (Plaintiff); Larissa Chism (Plaintiff); Margaret Atkins (Plaintiff); Amalia Perez (Plaintiff); Brian Alatorre (Plaintiff); Jesse Alatorre (Plaintiff); Sandra Harris (Plaintiff); Steven Harris, II (Plaintiff); Damian Pensamiento (Plaintiff); Lucy Vasquez (Plaintiff); Santiago Martinez (Plaintiff); Mary Calderon (Plaintiff); Alyssa Pensamiento (Plaintiff); John Burton (Plaintiff); Tatiana Willliams (Plaintiff); John Burton, Jr. (Plaintiff); Jaylen Williams (Plaintiff); Anthony Richardson (Plaintiff); Darryl Richardson (Plaintiff); Darryl Richardson, Jr. (Plaintiff); Cynthia Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Luna Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Maria Del Carmen Espino (Plaintiff); Braulio Garcia Espino (Plaintiff); Somneang Mann (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less