This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/20/2022 at 18:17:00 (UTC).

TYLER SCOTT HURST VS GENERAL MOTORS COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 TYLER SCOTT HURST filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SHIRLEY K. WATKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1052

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SHIRLEY K. WATKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HURST TYLER SCOTT

Defendants

GENERAL MOTORS COMPANY

GENERAL MOTORS LLC

SILVER STAR MOTOR CAR COMPANY DBA SILVER STAR CHEVROLET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARKIN STEVEN J

Defendant Attorney

SHUGART JONATHAN M.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/11/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/10/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/10/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/10/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

9/7/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

9/13/2021: Answer

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

1/6/2022: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Settlement

1/5/2022: Notice of Settlement

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2022
  • Hearing02/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department T at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by TYLER SCOTT HURST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by GENERAL MOTORS COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by TYLER SCOTT HURST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by TYLER SCOTT HURST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by TYLER SCOTT HURST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by TYLER SCOTT HURST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SILVER STAR MOTOR CAR COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARKIN STEVEN J