This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2022 at 06:02:20 (UTC).

TYLER DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS SUMMITRIDGE PROPERTIES, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/11/2022 TYLER DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SUMMITRIDGE PROPERTIES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8799

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TYLER DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

SUMMITRIDGE PROPERTIES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERTS PATRICK M.

Defendant Attorney

BALLARD JONATHAN OLDHAM

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

3/11/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

3/11/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

3/11/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/11/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/11/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/11/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/11/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

4/1/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/22/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

5/13/2022: Answer

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/13/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/23/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Trial Brief - TRIAL BRIEF AT TIME FOR APPEARANCE AT JULY 26, 2022 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/11/2022: Trial Brief - TRIAL BRIEF AT TIME FOR APPEARANCE AT JULY 26, 2022 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement

7/11/2022: Case Management Statement

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2022
  • Hearing07/26/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 12 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by TYLER DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketTrial Brief (AT TIME FOR APPEARANCE AT JULY 26, 2022 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by TYLER DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by TYLER DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by SUMMITRIDGE PROPERTIES, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SUMMITRIDGE PROPERTIES, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by TYLER DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by TYLER DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by TYLER DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by TYLER DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TYLER DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBERTS PATRICK