This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2022 at 09:29:00 (UTC).

TYLER DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS HUDSON SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, A NEW YORK CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/08/2021 TYLER DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HUDSON SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, A NEW YORK CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0814

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TYLER DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION

Defendants

ROCKHILL INSURANCE COMPANY

HUDSON SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

THORNTON TIMOTHY M.

ROBERTS PATRICK M

Defendant Attorney

SCOTT STEPHEN A.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/8/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/25/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

1/13/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

2/9/2021: Answer

Proof of Service by Mail

2/2/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 05/17/2021

5/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 05/17/2021

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY M. THORNTON, JR. IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

5/20/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY M. THORNTON, JR. IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

5/26/2021: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/01/2021

6/1/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/01/2021

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Order to Show Cause Re: (Sanctions, including dismissal, for Plaintiff's Failure to Appear at the CMC) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 24; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/01/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by Hudson Specialty Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY M. THORNTON, JR. IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE); Filed by Tyler Development Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 05/17/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Hudson Specialty Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Tyler Development Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Tyler Development Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Tyler Development Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Tyler Development Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Tyler Development Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TYLER DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Hudson Specialty Ins Co is a litigant

Latest cases where ROCKHILL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCOTT, STEPHEN A.