This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/01/2021 at 15:40:19 (UTC).

TWANDA GLENN VS SATISH R. BHAGAT, THE TRUSTEE OF SATISH R. BHAGAT AND PARULATA S. BHAGAT AB LIVING TRUST, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/30/2021 TWANDA GLENN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SATISH R BHAGAT, THE TRUSTEE OF SATISH R BHAGAT AND PARULATA S BHAGAT AB LIVING TRUST. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5998

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GLENN TWANDA

Defendants

BHAGAT PARULATA S.

BHAGAT SATISH R.

PARULATA S. BHAGAT THE TRUSTEE OF SATISH R. BHAGAT AND PARULATA S. BHAGAT AB LIVING TRUST

SATISH R. BHAGAT THE TRUSTEE OF SATISH R. BHAGAT AND PARULATA S. BHAGAT AB LIVING TRUST

TOWER MOTEL LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VIRAG BRIAN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/30/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2024
  • Hearing09/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • Hearing03/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • Hearing03/16/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Twanda Glenn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Twanda Glenn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Twanda Glenn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VIRAG BRIAN