Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/16/2019 at 20:42:23 (UTC).

TURTLE ROCK STUDIOS INC VS DIGITAL DEVELOPMENT MANAGEMENT IN

Case Summary

On 03/29/2017 TURTLE ROCK STUDIOS INC filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against DIGITAL DEVELOPMENT MANAGEMENT IN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD B. MORETON, JR.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9126

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDWARD B. MORETON, JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

TURTLE ROCK STUDIOS INC.

Defendant and Respondent

DIGITAL DEVELOPMENT MANAGEMENT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KAPGAN YURY ESQ.

 

Court Documents

TURTLE ROCK STUDIOS, INC.'S NOTICE OF APPEAL OF LABOR COMMISSIONER'S "CERTIFICATION OF LACK OF CONTROVERSY WITHIN THE MEANING OF LABOR CODE 1700.44; ORDER DISMISSING PETITION TO DETERMINE CONTROVERSY"

3/29/2017: TURTLE ROCK STUDIOS, INC.'S NOTICE OF APPEAL OF LABOR COMMISSIONER'S "CERTIFICATION OF LACK OF CONTROVERSY WITHIN THE MEANING OF LABOR CODE 1700.44; ORDER DISMISSING PETITION TO DETERMINE CONTROVERSY"

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

3/29/2017: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DIGITAL DEVELOPMENT MANAGEMENT, INC.'S MOTION TO DIMSMISS NOTICE OF APPEAL

5/10/2017: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DIGITAL DEVELOPMENT MANAGEMENT, INC.'S MOTION TO DIMSMISS NOTICE OF APPEAL

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DIGITAL DEVELOPMENT MANAGEMENT, INC. TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF APPEAL; ETC.

5/10/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DIGITAL DEVELOPMENT MANAGEMENT, INC. TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF APPEAL; ETC.

DECLARATION OF SACHA V. EMANUEL IN SUPPORT OF DIGITAL DEVELOPMENT MANAGEMENT, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS NOTICE OF APPEAL

5/10/2017: DECLARATION OF SACHA V. EMANUEL IN SUPPORT OF DIGITAL DEVELOPMENT MANAGEMENT, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS NOTICE OF APPEAL

Unknown

5/12/2017: Unknown

Proof of Service

5/16/2017: Proof of Service

TURTLE ROCK STUDIOS, INC.?S OPPOSITION TO DIGITAL DEVELOPMENT MANAGEMENT, INC.?S MOTION TO DISMISS NOTICE OF APPEAL

5/19/2017: TURTLE ROCK STUDIOS, INC.?S OPPOSITION TO DIGITAL DEVELOPMENT MANAGEMENT, INC.?S MOTION TO DISMISS NOTICE OF APPEAL

Proof of Service

5/19/2017: Proof of Service

DECLARATION OF RACHEL BRESSI IN SUPPORT OF TURTLE ROCK STUDIOS, INC.?S OPPOSITION TO DIGITAL DEVELOPMENT MANAGEMENT, INC.?S MOTION TO DISMISS NOTICE OF APPEAL

5/19/2017: DECLARATION OF RACHEL BRESSI IN SUPPORT OF TURTLE ROCK STUDIOS, INC.?S OPPOSITION TO DIGITAL DEVELOPMENT MANAGEMENT, INC.?S MOTION TO DISMISS NOTICE OF APPEAL

Unknown

5/22/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

5/23/2017: Minute Order

REPLY OF DIGITAL DEVELOPMENT MANAGEMENT, INC. TO TURTLE ROCK STUDIOS, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS NOTICE OF APPEAL

5/25/2017: REPLY OF DIGITAL DEVELOPMENT MANAGEMENT, INC. TO TURTLE ROCK STUDIOS, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS NOTICE OF APPEAL

Minute Order

6/2/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING ON DIGITAL DEVELOPMENT MANAGEMENT, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS

6/5/2017: NOTICE OF RULING ON DIGITAL DEVELOPMENT MANAGEMENT, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS

6/8/2017: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS

PROOF OF SERVICE

7/27/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE

FINAL JUDGMENT

7/31/2017: FINAL JUDGMENT

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2017
  • FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Turtle Rock Studios, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • at 09:15 AM in Department 44; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • Order; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Digital Development Management, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON DIGITAL DEVELOPMENT MANAGEMENT, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • at 09:15 AM in Department 44; Hearing on Motion to Dismiss (Motion to Dismiss; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2017
  • Notice of Motion; Filed by Digital Development Management, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by Digital Development Management, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Petition; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • TURTLE ROCK STUDIOS, INC.'S NOTICE OF APPEAL OF LABOR COMMISSIONER'S "CERTIFICATION OF LACK OF CONTROVERSY WITHIN THE MEANING OF LABOR CODE 1700.44; ORDER DISMISSING PETITION TO DETERMINE CONTROVERSY" PURSUANT TO LABOR CODE 1700.44(A)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less