Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/04/2020 at 11:44:20 (UTC).

TUMANOVA, ANASTASIA VS HABIB, SHADY

Case Summary

On 04/29/2020 TUMANOVA, ANASTASIA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against HABIB, SHADY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3830

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TUMANOVA ANASTASIA

Respondent

HABIB SHADY

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of Summons

6/5/2020: Proof of Service of Summons

Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition

6/5/2020: Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition

FL_General Family Law - FL - Rejection - Initial Filing

6/18/2020: FL_General Family Law - FL - Rejection - Initial Filing

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

6/23/2020: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Proof of Service - Mail - Response to Dissolution & Declaration

6/23/2020: Proof of Service - Mail - Response to Dissolution & Declaration

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

6/23/2020: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Declaration - UCCJEA

6/23/2020: Declaration - UCCJEA

Summons

4/29/2020: Summons

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

4/29/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Declaration - UCCJEA

4/29/2020: Declaration - UCCJEA

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

4/29/2020: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

4/29/2020: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Notice - Case Assignment

4/30/2020: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

4/30/2020: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail (Response to Dissolution & Declaration ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketNotice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less