This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/22/2021 at 11:16:02 (UTC).

TUFELD CORPORATION VS BEVERLY HILLS GATEWAY LP

Case Summary

On 01/25/2018 TUFELD CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BEVERLY HILLS GATEWAY LP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL, DENNIS J. LANDIN, SAMANTHA JESSNER and DAVID J. COWAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1352

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL

DENNIS J. LANDIN

SAMANTHA JESSNER

DAVID J. COWAN

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

TUFELD CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

BEVERLY HILLS GATEWAY LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Not Classified By Court

CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

GOLDMAN JAMES L. ESQ.

MCKISSICK SEAN GERALD

GOLDMAN JAMES

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LOEB & LOEB LLP

FELS ARTHUR DESBARATS

MURPHY DANIEL GENE

MURPHY DANIEL G.

FRIEDMAN DANIEL JOSEPH

PAULY ANDREW STUART

REDDIE SCOTT M

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

REDDIE SCOTT M

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

GOLDMAN JAMES

Not Classified By Court Attorney

HANNA ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Brief - BRIEF POST-TRIAL BRIEF OF DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT BEVERLY HILLS GATEWAY, L.P.

1/27/2021: Brief - BRIEF POST-TRIAL BRIEF OF DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT BEVERLY HILLS GATEWAY, L.P.

Notice of Related Case

8/12/2020: Notice of Related Case

Order - RULING RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

3/3/2020: Order - RULING RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Motion for Summary Judgment - Motion for Summary Judgment Corrected Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment

12/31/2018: Motion for Summary Judgment - Motion for Summary Judgment Corrected Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JAMES GOLDMAN IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

1/23/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JAMES GOLDMAN IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE FILING OF (1) VERIFIED SECOND AMENDED ANSWER OF DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT BEVERLY HILLS GATEWAY, L.P.; AND (2) F

12/4/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE FILING OF (1) VERIFIED SECOND AMENDED ANSWER OF DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT BEVERLY HILLS GATEWAY, L.P.; AND (2) F

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT AND CROSSCOMPLAINANT BEVERLY HILLS GATEWAY, L.P. FOR A CONTINUANCE OF THE TRIAL DATE

5/3/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT AND CROSSCOMPLAINANT BEVERLY HILLS GATEWAY, L.P. FOR A CONTINUANCE OF THE TRIAL DATE

VERIFIED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT BEVERLY HILLS GATEWAY, L.P.

6/8/2018: VERIFIED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT BEVERLY HILLS GATEWAY, L.P.

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

2/3/2021: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING; DECLARATION OF ARTHUR FELS

2/8/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING; DECLARATION OF ARTHUR FELS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL FOR CLOSING ARGUMENTS)

2/3/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL FOR CLOSING ARGUMENTS)

Request - REQUEST PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING

2/4/2021: Request - REQUEST PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING

Brief - BRIEF PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT TUFELD CORPORATION'S CLOSING BRIEF

1/27/2021: Brief - BRIEF PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT TUFELD CORPORATION'S CLOSING BRIEF

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL (3-4 DAY ESTIMATE))

1/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL (3-4 DAY ESTIMATE))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL (3-4 DAY ESTIMATE))

1/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL (3-4 DAY ESTIMATE))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL (3-4 DAY ESTIMATE))

12/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL (3-4 DAY ESTIMATE))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL (3-4 DAY ESTIMATE))

12/29/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL (3-4 DAY ESTIMATE))

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

1/4/2021: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

175 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketOpposition (TO PLAINTIFF?S REQUEST FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING; DECLARATION OF ARTHUR FELS); Filed by Beverly Hills Gateway, LP, a California limited partnership (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketRequest (Plaintiff's Request for Supplemental Briefing); Filed by Tufeld Corporation, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial (For Closing Arguments) - Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial For Closing Arguments)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by Beverly Hills Gateway, LP, a California limited partnership (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketBrief (Post-Trial Brief of Defendant and Cross-Complainant Beverly Hills Gateway, L.P.); Filed by Beverly Hills Gateway, LP, a California limited partnership (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketBrief (Plaintiff and Cross-Defendant Tufeld Corporation's Closing Brief); Filed by Tufeld Corporation, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • Docketat 10:45 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial ((3-4 day estimate)) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ((Non-Jury Trial (3-4 day estimate))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • Docketat 10:45 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial ((3-4 day estimate)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
269 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Tufeld Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Tufeld Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (LIS PENDENS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF, TO QUIET TITLE, AND FOR CANCELLATION OF WRITTEN INSTRUMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Tufeld Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

JAMES GOLDMAN (State Bar No. 57127) jgoldman@millerbarondess.com

SEAN G. McKISSICK (State Bar No. 261657) smckissick@millerbarondess.com

MILLER BARONDESS, LLP

1999 Avenue of the Stars, Suite 1000 Supr-i FFL ED

Los Angeles, California 90067 ¢ ,M OF 1o Telephone: (310) 552-4400 PN A g Facsimile: (310) 552-8400 FEB ¢ 6 20'3 Attorneys for Plaintiff i”e"'}“ Carig), &xe. o0,

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, CENTRAL DISTRICT

STANLEY MOSK COURTHOUSE

TUFELD CORPORATION, a California - CASE NO. BC691352 corporation

ORIGINAL PROOF OF SERVICE OF

Plaintiff, SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT V. ' Action Filed: January 25, 2018

Tnal Date: None Set BEVERLY HILLS GATEWAY,LP,a | ‘California limited partnership; and DOES 1- Assigned for All Purposes to: 250, inclusive Hon. Michael J. Raphael, Dept. 51

Defendants.

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****1352    Hearing Date: August 20, 2020    Dept: 51

Tufeld Corp v. Beverly Hills Gateway, LP, ****1352

The Court has reviewed the notice of related cases regarding ****1352, presently before this Court, and 20STCV25920, now before Dept. 73, and declines to relate them for the following reasons:

Both cases seem to involve the same estoppel statements executed in 2007 and 2017. However, the recently filed 20STCV25920 matter only seeks declaratory relief regarding reimbursement rights arising from enforceability of the estoppel as a matter of contract, whereas ****1352 concerns possession of the subject property and valid lease terms as central issues. The estoppel statements are relevant in ****1352 only as an evidentiary matter, but 20STCV25920 requests statutory interpretation of those statements.

While determinations in ****1352 can have an impact on the extent/amount of reimbursement Tufeld has to pay to Chicago Title, 20STCV25920 only seeks to determine whether Tufeld has a duty to reimburse Chicago Title at all. Also, ****1352 is almost three years old and extensive discovery has taken place and several motions have been heard, whereas 20STCV25920 was filed less than 60 days ago. The relation of the cases could prejudice the defendant/cross-complainant BHG in ****1352, who is not even a party in the newly filed case.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TUFELD CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant