This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/21/2021 at 00:09:34 (UTC).

TSOVIK GASPARYAN VS RICHARD PAUL ROCHE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/25/2021 TSOVIK GASPARYAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RICHARD PAUL ROCHE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9345

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GASPARYAN TSOVIK

Defendants

ROCHE RICHARD PAUL

WELSH FREAR BARBARA HUNTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AIRAPETIAN STEPHAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2024
  • Hearing10/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • Hearing04/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • Hearing04/10/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Tsovik Gasparyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Tsovik Gasparyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Tsovik Gasparyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AIRAPETIAN STEPHAN