Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/15/2021 at 19:36:06 (UTC).

TRUST (INCLUDING WILL) CREATED UNDER THE AGREEMENT DATED AUGUST 22, 2019 BY THEODORE SHIGEKAZU KISHIYAMA

Case Summary

On 02/19/2020 TRUST INCLUDING WILL CREATED UNDER THE AGREEMENT DATED AUGUST 22, 2019 BY THEODORE SHIGEKAZU KISHIYAMA was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MAY, GUS T. and PRIVER, MARK S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1621

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MAY, GUS T.

PRIVER, MARK S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

OSAKO DAVID P.

Respondent

BECKMANN-RAFALOWSKI DENISA A

Not Classified By Court

TRUST INCLUDING WILL CREATED UNDER THE AGREEMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

FORRY CRAIG BRIAN

Respondent Attorney

RUIZ LOUIE ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing SAP

1/26/2021: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing SAP

Minute Order

2/9/2021: Minute Order

Supplement - Supplement Petitioner's Response to Probate Notes 1/13/21

1/18/2021: Supplement - Supplement Petitioner's Response to Probate Notes 1/13/21

Declaration - Declaration supporting Nunc Pro Tunc Application

9/4/2020: Declaration - Declaration supporting Nunc Pro Tunc Application

Objection - Trust Petition

9/24/2020: Objection - Trust Petition

Subpoena - Issued - Subpoena Kaiser Documents SUBP-010

9/15/2020: Subpoena - Issued - Subpoena Kaiser Documents SUBP-010

Request - for Refund Denied - Fee Waiver applies to documents filed after 3/27/20

9/4/2020: Request - for Refund Denied - Fee Waiver applies to documents filed after 3/27/20

Minute Order

8/27/2020: Minute Order

Supplement - Opposition To Demurrer.

8/17/2020: Supplement - Opposition To Demurrer.

Objection - Objections of Petioner David P. Osako To July 16, 2020 Hearing, Order, and Notice of Order

7/22/2020: Objection - Objections of Petioner David P. Osako To July 16, 2020 Hearing, Order, and Notice of Order

Proof of Service - Proof of Service By First Class Mail - Civil

7/22/2020: Proof of Service - Proof of Service By First Class Mail - Civil

Minute Order

7/16/2020: Minute Order

Summons - Summons (Ruiz)

6/16/2020: Summons - Summons (Ruiz)

Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Subsequent) - Second Amended Petition To Contest the Trust of Theodore Shigekazu Kishiyama......

6/16/2020: Petition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Subsequent) - Second Amended Petition To Contest the Trust of Theodore Shigekazu Kishiyama......

Declaration - Declaration

5/22/2020: Declaration - Declaration

Motion - Strike

5/22/2020: Motion - Strike

Proof of Service - by Hand Delivery

5/4/2020: Proof of Service - by Hand Delivery

Notice - and Acknowledgment of Receipt

4/21/2020: Notice - and Acknowledgment of Receipt

92 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2021
  • Hearing06/15/2021 at 9:30 AM in Probate Department 2D at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Petition Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney (Substitution of Attorney ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketAssignment (R.Kishiyama Assignment ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (POS RK Assignment ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation to Consolidate - Denied ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNotice - Ruling (NOTICE OF RULING ON RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO QUASH OR LIMIT DEPOSITION SUBPOENA ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 2D, May, Gus T., Presiding; Petition Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
124 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Continued Hearing Re: First Amended Petition to Contest the Trust and Will of Theodore Shigekazu Kishiyama ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketNotice (and Acknowledgment of Receipt ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • Docketin Probate Department 2D, May, Gus T., Presiding; Court Order Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketSupplement (- First Amended Petition to Contest the Trust and Will of Theodore Shigekazu Kishiyama ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketPetition - Trust/Pursuant Prob Code Sec 17200 (Initial) (Petition to Contest the Trust and Will of Theodore Shigekazu Kishiyama ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUIZ LOUIE ANTHONY