Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2021 at 09:53:04 (UTC).

TRUJILLO, GABRIELA VS LOPEZ, EDUARDO ANOTIO

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 TRUJILLO, GABRIELA filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against LOPEZ, EDUARDO ANOTIO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROSEN, DAVID A. and PELLMAN, AMY M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0220

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROSEN, DAVID A.

PELLMAN, AMY M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TRUJILLO GABRIELA

Respondent

LOPEZ EDUARDO ANOTIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SIMONS STEVEN AMES

Respondent Attorney

LOZANO HORACIO

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

5/24/2021: Minute Order

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

4/19/2021: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

4/19/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

3/23/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

3/23/2021: Minute Order

Substitution of Attorney - Atty. Steven A. Simons Sub In

4/12/2021: Substitution of Attorney - Atty. Steven A. Simons Sub In

Minute Order

4/19/2021: Minute Order

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

2/26/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Statement - Financial

2/26/2021: Statement - Financial

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

2/26/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - Granted

2/26/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - Granted

Request - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation)

2/26/2021: Request - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation)

Certificate of Completion - Our Children FIrst

3/15/2021: Certificate of Completion - Our Children FIrst

Proof of Service - DV105, DV109, DV110

3/15/2021: Proof of Service - DV105, DV109, DV110

Response - Domestic Violence

3/18/2021: Response - Domestic Violence

FCS-Mediation Memo

3/22/2021: FCS-Mediation Memo

Substitution of Attorney - Atty. Horacio Lozano Sub In

3/24/2021: Substitution of Attorney - Atty. Horacio Lozano Sub In

FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Participate in Mediation

2/26/2021: FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Participate in Mediation

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 87, Pellman, Amy M., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Off Calendar - Per Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 87, Pellman, Amy M., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketResponse - Domestic Violence; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (DV105, DV109, DV110 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Completion (Our Children FIrst ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109) (Granted ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketStatement - Financial; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIMONS STEVEN AMES