This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2023 at 00:19:51 (UTC).

TRUIST BANK VS VICTIORIA MERACHLYAN

Case Summary

On 12/15/2022 TRUIST BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VICTIORIA MERACHLYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RALPH C. HOFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1033

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RALPH C. HOFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRUIST BANK DBA LIGHTSTREAM

Defendant

MERACHLYAN VICTIORIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AFZALNIA AFSANEH

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/15/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/15/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/15/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

12/15/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/15/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION RE: VENUE

12/15/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION RE: VENUE

Complaint

12/15/2022: Complaint

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

1/13/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE

Proof of Service by Mail

2/28/2023: Proof of Service by Mail

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION REGARDING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

2/28/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION REGARDING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

Case Management Statement

2/28/2023: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

3/9/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/13/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/14/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

4/14/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

Proof of Service by Mail

4/14/2023: Proof of Service by Mail

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2023
  • Hearing06/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • Hearing06/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department D at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketNotice Notice of Order to Show Cause; Filed by: Truist Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Victioria Merachlyan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Truist Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Victioria Merachlyan (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketNotice Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Truist Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Victioria Merachlyan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Truist Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Victioria Merachlyan (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/11/2023; Service Cost: 95.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D Held - Continued was rescheduled to 06/27/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ralph C. Hofer in Department D Glendale Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Truist Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Victioria Merachlyan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Truist Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Victioria Merachlyan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Truist Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Victioria Merachlyan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration Re: Venue; Filed by: Truist Bank (Plaintiff); As to: Victioria Merachlyan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less