This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/27/2021 at 00:28:45 (UTC).

TRUEWEST CARPET, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS SHANGRI-LA CONSTRUCTION, LP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/29/2021 TRUEWEST CARPET, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SHANGRI-LA CONSTRUCTION, LP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0834

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRUEWEST CARPET INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

813 SOUTH FLOWER STREET ASSOCIATES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

PACIFICA HOTELS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SHANGRI-LA CONSTRUCTION LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

SLI MANAGEMENT CORP. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERKE MICHAEL N.

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/7/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/30/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/29/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2021
  • Hearing10/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by TRUEWEST CARPET, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by TRUEWEST CARPET, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by TRUEWEST CARPET, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by TRUEWEST CARPET, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SLI MANAGEMENT CORP. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Pacifica Hotel Company is a litigant

Latest cases where 813 SOUTH FLOWER STREET ASSOCIATES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where SHANGRI-LA CONSTRUCTION L.P. is a litigant