Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/02/2020 at 09:18:06 (UTC).

TRUE HOSPITALITY INC. VS MINIMAL EFFORT LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/09/2018 TRUE HOSPITALITY INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MINIMAL EFFORT LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPERT A. BYRDSONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4425

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRUE HOSPITALITY INC.

Defendants

MINIMAL EFFORT LLC

UNDERRATED PRESENTS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BOTWINICK RYAN

UNDERRATED PRESENTS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HOWARD JAMES ROGER

HOWARD JAMES

Defendant Attorneys

BRAUNSTEIN CLARK ANTHONY

ROSENBERGER ELLIOT ALBERT

BILETSKY JOSHUA

 

Court Documents

Informal Discovery Conference

2/10/2020: Informal Discovery Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

2/11/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Answer

10/1/2019: Answer

Reply - REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

8/9/2019: Reply - REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) BY D...)

8/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) BY D...)

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT UNDERRATED PRESENTS INC.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE; FURTHER DECLARATION OF ELLIOT A. ROSENBERGER

8/8/2019: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT UNDERRATED PRESENTS INC.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE; FURTHER DECLARATION OF ELLIOT A. ROSENBERGER

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JAMES HOWARI) RE: OSC

8/5/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JAMES HOWARI) RE: OSC

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

8/7/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST

6/18/2019: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST

Case Management Statement

7/10/2019: Case Management Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ANNIE BERLIN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER

7/18/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ANNIE BERLIN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION RE: DEFENDANT UNDERRATED PRESENTS INC.'S JOINDER IN DEFENDANTS MINIMAL EFFORT LLC'S AND RYAN BOTWINICK'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

5/22/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION RE: DEFENDANT UNDERRATED PRESENTS INC.'S JOINDER IN DEFENDANTS MINIMAL EFFORT LLC'S AND RYAN BOTWINICK'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/11/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

3/7/2019: Case Management Statement

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

2/13/2019: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/23/2019: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/9/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/9/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2020
  • Hearing09/21/2020 at 09:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • Hearing09/11/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketStipulation - No Order (Joint Stipulation Re Discovery after IDC); Filed by True Hospitality Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference; Filed by Minimal Effort LLC (Defendant); Ryan Botwinick (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketJoint Informal Discovery Conference Statement; Filed by True Hospitality Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Minimal Effort LLC (Defendant); Ryan Botwinick (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketMotion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by Minimal Effort LLC (Defendant); Ryan Botwinick (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketDemurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by Minimal Effort LLC (Defendant); Ryan Botwinick (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketDeclaration (of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension); Filed by Minimal Effort LLC (Defendant); Ryan Botwinick (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by True Hospitality Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by True Hospitality Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNDERRATED PRESENTS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOWARD JAMES ROGER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOWARD JAMES