This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/10/2021 at 05:38:15 (UTC).

TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE VS SHANGHAILANDER PALACE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/11/2020 TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against SHANGHAILANDER PALACE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0652

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Defendants

LU MIN AKA VICTORIA LU

YAN QINGYUAN

SHANGHAILANDER PALACE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SELVIN GARY D.

Defendant Attorneys

WATKINS ASHTON

SCHINDLER ERIC

WATKINS ASHTON RYAN

SCHINDLER ERIC JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION OF WARREN HIGLEY

1/12/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF WARREN HIGLEY

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARK BEERS

1/12/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARK BEERS

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

1/12/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Request for Judicial Notice

1/12/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

Case Management Statement

1/4/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/4/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/5/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

11/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE BY PLAINTIFF RE SERVICE OF PROCESS

10/28/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE BY PLAINTIFF RE SERVICE OF PROCESS

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

10/9/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

10/9/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Proof of Service by Mail

9/2/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

9/2/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/11/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/11/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

8/11/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/11/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

8/11/2020: Complaint

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2022
  • Hearing01/18/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • Hearing01/11/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • Hearing05/07/2021 at 14:00 PM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 03/16/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Mark Beers); Filed by TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by MIN LU (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by TRUCK INSURANCE EXCHANGE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Truck Insurance Exchange is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHINDLER ERIC

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WATKINS ASHTON RYAN