Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2021 at 11:11:17 (UTC).

TROY DAVID RAWLS VS ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/03/2019 TROY DAVID RAWLS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3239

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAWLS TROY DAVID

Defendants

ALBERTSON'S LLC

ABS CA-O LLC

ALBERTSON'S REALTY LLC

ALBERTSON'S STORES SUB LLC

ALBERTSONS COMPANIES INC.

SAFEWAY INC.

NEW ALBERTONS L.P.

ACCUTHERM REFRIGERATION INC. DOE 51

ACCUTHERM REFRIGERATION INC. DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CASSANDRA GIORGIO

Defendant Attorneys

STONE GREGORY E.

OFFENHAUSER TYLER D.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE NOTICE OF RULING

12/31/2020: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE NOTICE OF RULING

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/23/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

12/23/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

10/21/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

10/22/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/5/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

11/17/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/17/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Request - REQUEST FOR PRIOR PLEADINGS AND DISCOVERY

11/23/2020: Request - REQUEST FOR PRIOR PLEADINGS AND DISCOVERY

Answer

11/23/2020: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

12/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Answer

10/31/2019: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/9/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

7/9/2019: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/3/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/3/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/3/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/3/2019: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2022
  • Hearing06/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • Hearing03/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • Hearing03/08/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Motion to Compel Deposition of Plaintiff) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by TROY DAVID RAWLS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by TROY DAVID RAWLS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by TROY DAVID RAWLS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by TROY DAVID RAWLS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by TROY DAVID RAWLS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by TROY DAVID RAWLS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by TROY DAVID RAWLS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by TROY DAVID RAWLS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABS CA-O LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ALBERTSON'S REALTY LLC is a litigant