This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2019 at 00:55:00 (UTC).

TROY COMPANY VS DENNIS ALLEN ASSOCIATES ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/12/2018 TROY COMPANY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against DENNIS ALLEN ASSOCIATES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MALCOLM MACKEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3778

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MALCOLM MACKEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

TROY COMPANY

Respondents, Defendants and Not Classified By Court

SARAH A. SIBIA TRUST

DENNIS ALLEN ASSOCIATES

SIBIA SARAH ANN

ALLEN CONSTRUCTION

DOES 1-60

Defendant, Respondent and Not Classified By Court

ALLEN CONSTRUCTION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

THE GREEN LAW GROUP LLP

Defendant Attorney

BUYNAK FAUVER ARCHBALD & SPRAY LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/20/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

9/26/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

9/7/2018: NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/24/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASES BEING DEEMED RELATED

8/16/2018: NOTICE OF CASES BEING DEEMED RELATED

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/21/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

8/9/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

7/26/2018: NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/27/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

7/30/2018: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

7/12/2018: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

COMPLAINT FOR: 1 BREACH OF CONTRACT ;ETC

7/12/2018: COMPLAINT FOR: 1 BREACH OF CONTRACT ;ETC

SUMMONS

7/12/2018: SUMMONS

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • Notice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Dennis Allen Associates (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Troy Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Troy Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2018
  • Notice of Related Case; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Troy Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Troy Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Troy Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1 BREACH OF CONTRACT ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TROY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where DENNIS ALLEN ASSOCIATES is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLEN CONSTRUCTION is a litigant