This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/26/2019 at 01:51:21 (UTC).

TROPE & TROPE VS KELLEY NELSON

Case Summary

On 11/27/2017 TROPE TROPE filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against KELLEY NELSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID SOTELO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1564

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID SOTELO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

TROPE & TROPE

Defendant and Respondent

NELSON KELLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FRIEDMAN IRA M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

1/29/2018: Minute Order

Proof of Service

1/23/2018: Proof of Service

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

12/18/2017: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/18/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF HEARING ON VERIFIED PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR COURT APPOINTMENT OF AN ARBITRATOR

11/30/2017: NOTICE OF HEARING ON VERIFIED PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR COURT APPOINTMENT OF AN ARBITRATOR

VERIFIED PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR COURT APPOINTMENT OF AN ARBITRATOR; ETC

11/27/2017: VERIFIED PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR COURT APPOINTMENT OF AN ARBITRATOR; ETC

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by TROPE & TROPE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • at 08:31 AM in Department 40; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ORDER AFTER HEARING ON VERIFIED PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR COURT APPOINTMENT OF AN ARBITRATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by TROPE & TROPE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by TROPE & TROPE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF: ORDER AFTER HEARING ON VERIFIED PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR COURT APPOINTMENT OF AN ARBITRATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 40; Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • ORDER AFTER HEARING ON VERIFIED PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR COURT APPOINTMENT OF AN ARBITRATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by TROPE & TROPE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON VERIFIED PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR COURT APPOINTMENT OF AN ARBITRATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Notice of Hearing; Filed by TROPE & TROPE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • VERIFIED PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR COURT APPOINTMENT OF AN ARBITRATOR; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • Petition; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TROPE & TROPE LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRIEDMAN IRA M.