This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/05/2018 at 15:23:29 (UTC).

TROPE & TROPE ET AL VS COURTNEY SCOTT

Case Summary

On 06/26/2017 TROPE TROPE filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against COURTNEY SCOTT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MALCOLM MACKEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0017

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MALCOLM MACKEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

TROPE & TROPE

TROPE & TROPE LLP

Defendant and Respondent

SCOTT COURTNEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FRIEDMAN & FRIEDMAN LAWYERS

 

Court Documents

ARBITRATION AWARD

12/14/2017: ARBITRATION AWARD

NOTICE OF HEARING ON VERIFIED PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND ENTER JUDGMENT IN CONFORMITY THEREWITH AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PETITION

12/14/2017: NOTICE OF HEARING ON VERIFIED PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND ENTER JUDGMENT IN CONFORMITY THEREWITH AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PETITION

VERIFIED PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND ENTER JUDGMENT IN CONFORMITY THEREWITH AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PETITION

12/14/2017: VERIFIED PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND ENTER JUDGMENT IN CONFORMITY THEREWITH AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PETITION

Minute Order

1/19/2018: Minute Order

VERIFIED PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR COURT APPOINTMENT OF AN ARBITRATOR; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR APPOINTMEN

6/26/2017: VERIFIED PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR COURT APPOINTMENT OF AN ARBITRATOR; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR APPOINTMEN

NOTICE OF HEARING ON VERIFIED PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR COURT APPOINTMENT OF AN ARBITRATOR

6/29/2017: NOTICE OF HEARING ON VERIFIED PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR COURT APPOINTMENT OF AN ARBITRATOR

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE

8/10/2017: PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE

ORDER AFTER ON PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR APPOINTMENT OF AN ARBITRATOR

8/25/2017: ORDER AFTER ON PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR APPOINTMENT OF AN ARBITRATOR

Minute Order

8/25/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING ON PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR COURT APPOINTMENT OF AN ARBITRATOR

8/28/2017: NOTICE OF RULING ON PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR COURT APPOINTMENT OF AN ARBITRATOR

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF: ORDER AFTER HEARING ON PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR COURT APPOINTMENT OF AN ARBITRATOR

10/2/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF: ORDER AFTER HEARING ON PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR COURT APPOINTMENT OF AN ARBITRATOR

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2018
  • at 08:30 am in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Petition Confirm Arbitration Award - Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • Notice (OF TAKING MATTER OFF CALENDAR ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • Award-Arbitrator (arbitrator: arnold h. gold ); Filed by Arbitrator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • Petition (verified petition to confirm arbitration award and enter judgment in conformity therewith and memornndum of p's and a's in support ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • Notice of Motion (hearing on petition to confirm arbitration award and enter judgment in conformity therewith and memorandum of p's and a's in support of petiton ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail (order after hearing on petition to compel binding arbitration and for court appointment of an arbitrator ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Notice of Ruling (ON PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR COURT APPOINT- MENT OF AN ARBITRATOR ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • at 08:30 am in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Motion to Compel - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • Proof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • Notice of Hearing (ON VERIFIED PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND FOR COURT APPOINTMENT OF AN ARBITRATOR ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TROPE & TROPE LLP is a litigant