This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/09/2019 at 04:31:19 (UTC).

TRONCOSO, CLAUDIA NINETTE VS TRONCOSO, EFREN JACINTO

Case Summary

On 03/16/2017 TRONCOSO, CLAUDIA NINETTE filed a Family - Legal Separation lawsuit against TRONCOSO, EFREN JACINTO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROSEN, DAVID A., SHORT, MICHELLE and WEISS, SUSAN K. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4736

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Legal Separation

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROSEN, DAVID A.

SHORT, MICHELLE

WEISS, SUSAN K

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TRONCOSO CLAUDIA NINETTE

Respondent

TRONCOSO EFREN JACINTO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2019
  • Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • at 8:30 AM in Department F48, Weiss, Susan K, Presiding; Order to Show Cause re: Entry of Judgment - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • at 8:30 AM in Department F48, Rosen, David A., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Substitution of Attorney (JIMENEZ OUT ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • at 8:30 AM in Department F48, Short, Michelle, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2017
  • Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 04-27-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Troncoso, Claudia ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 03-30-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Troncoso, Claudia ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Declaration - Income and Expense (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Troncoso, Claudia ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Declaration (Sep Prop - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Troncoso, Claudia ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Declaration (Com Prop - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Troncoso, Claudia ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Notice (of Case Assignment to DEPT F48 )

    Read MoreRead Less