Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2021 at 11:38:46 (UTC).

TRISTIAN STORMS, AN INDIVIDUAL VS JAI DAMONE KIBBLE, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/04/2020 TRISTIAN STORMS, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JAI DAMONE KIBBLE, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2312

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STORMS AN INDIVIDUAL TRISTIAN

Defendants

KIBBLE AN INDIVIDUAL JAI DAMONE

UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRADKIN IGOR ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

EISENBERG DANIEL ALEXANDER

HERZOG VANESSA K.

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER

5/12/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER

Answer

12/14/2020: Answer

Answer

12/16/2020: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

12/2/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

12/2/2020: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

11/16/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/20/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/4/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/4/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/4/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/4/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2023
  • Hearing11/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • Hearing05/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • Hearing04/20/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation and Protective Order); Filed by UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by JAI DAMONE KIBBLE, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by TRISTIAN STORMS, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by TRISTIAN STORMS, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by TRISTIAN STORMS, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by TRISTIAN STORMS, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by TRISTIAN STORMS, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EISENBERG DANIEL ALEXANDER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HERZOG VANESSA K.