This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/16/2022 at 03:37:38 (UTC).

TRIS CARPENTER VS AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES, DISTRICT COUNCIL 36, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/29/2021 TRIS CARPENTER filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES, DISTRICT COUNCIL 36. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9839

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARPENTER TRIS

Defendants

AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES DISTRICT COUNCIL 36

AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES NATIONAL HEADQUARTERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOOD MORGAN J.

Defendant Attorneys

ADAMS JOSHUA B

MARQUEZ-AVILA MITZI NUBIA

PLANK MICHAEL ELDREDGE

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/10/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/10/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

4/20/2022: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Case Management Statement

4/21/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/21/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/25/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

4/25/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

4/25/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Remand from Federal Court

3/22/2022: Notice of Remand from Federal Court

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REMAND FROM FEDERAL COURT)

3/24/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REMAND FROM FEDERAL COURT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REMAND FROM FEDERAL COURT) OF 03/24/2022

3/24/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REMAND FROM FEDERAL COURT) OF 03/24/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW PURSUANT TO LASC LOCAL RULE 3.22)

3/17/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW PURSUANT TO LASC LOCAL RULE 3.22)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW PURSUANT TO LASC LOCAL RULE 3.22) OF 03/17/2022

3/17/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW PURSUANT TO LASC LOCAL RULE 3.22) OF 03/17/2022

Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS OF REMOVED CASE

3/3/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS OF REMOVED CASE

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

12/16/2021: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF REMOVAL)

12/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF REMOVAL)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF REMOVAL) OF 12/17/2021

12/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF REMOVAL) OF 12/17/2021

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/8/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2023
  • Hearing08/14/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • Hearing08/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • Hearing11/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Tris Carpenter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, District Council 36 (Defendant); American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, National Headquarters (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, District Council 36 (Defendant); American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, National Headquarters (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, National Headquarters (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Tris Carpenter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Notice of Removal) of 12/17/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, National Headquarters (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Tris Carpenter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Tris Carpenter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Tris Carpenter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Tris Carpenter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Tris Carpenter (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES LOCAL 619 DISTRICT COUNCIL 36 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOOD MORGAN JAMES