This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/21/2021 at 20:17:40 (UTC).

TRINITY HERNANDEZ, BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, ADRINA GALLEGOS VS AZUSA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A GOVERNMENT ENTITY

Case Summary

On 11/13/2020 TRINITY HERNANDEZ, BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, ADRINA GALLEGOS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AZUSA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A GOVERNMENT ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3630

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDEZ BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM ADRINA GALLEGOS TRINITY

Defendant

AZUSA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT A GOVERNMENT ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BECKER TODD BENJAMIN BECKER

BECKER TODD

Defendant Attorney

PRECIADO ARTHUR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2023
  • Hearing11/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • Hearing05/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • Hearing04/29/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Azusa Unified School District, a government entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Trinity Hernandez, by and through her guardian ad litem, Adrina Gallegos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION); Filed by Azusa Unified School District, a government entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Trinity Hernandez, by and through her guardian ad litem, Adrina Gallegos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Trinity Hernandez, by and through her guardian ad litem, Adrina Gallegos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Trinity); Filed by Trinity Hernandez, by and through her guardian ad litem, Adrina Gallegos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Trinity); Filed by Trinity Hernandez, by and through her guardian ad litem, Adrina Gallegos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AZUSA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT A GOVERNMENT ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRECIADO ARTHUR