This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/16/2022 at 17:55:29 (UTC).

TRINH THAN VS DELTA AIR LINES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/16/2021 TRINH THAN filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against DELTA AIR LINES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5842

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THAN TRINH

Defendants

DELTA AIR LINES INC.

GALLEGOS TRACY

MISSERIAN ANDREA

RHODES JESSE

SAECHAO KEVIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SHEGERIAN CARNEY RICHARD

SHEGERIAN CARNEY R.

Defendant Attorneys

ANTONOPOULOS NICOLE

FREDERICK ANDREW P.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

5/5/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

5/5/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Answer

4/27/2022: Answer

Answer

4/27/2022: Answer

Answer

4/27/2022: Answer

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

4/29/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Proof of Personal Service

1/3/2022: Proof of Personal Service

RETURNED MAIL

1/13/2022: RETURNED MAIL

Answer

1/26/2022: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

3/2/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

3/28/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

3/28/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Answer

3/28/2022: Answer

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

3/28/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

12/20/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/20/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2022
  • Hearing06/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketNotice (OF CASE REASSIGNMENT); Filed by Trinh Than (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Carney R. Shegerian (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Jesse Rhodes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Andrea Misserian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Tracy Gallegos (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Trinh Than (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Trinh Than (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Trinh Than (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Trinh Than (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Trinh Than (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Management Conference]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Trinh Than (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Trinh Than (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Trinh Than (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Delta Air Lines Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shegerian, Carney R