This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/11/2019 at 00:05:33 (UTC).

TRINA ROSS VS HEALTH CARE PARTNERS MEDICAL GROUP ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/16/2018 TRINA ROSS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HEALTH CARE PARTNERS MEDICAL GROUP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK and DENNIS J. LANDIN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5058

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

DENNIS J. LANDIN

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

ROSS TRINA

Defendants and Respondents

HEALTH CARE PARTNERS MEDICAL GROUP

MORRIS LISA C.R.N.

DOES 1 TO 20

NOLASCO MARY LVN

WILSON SONE-SEERE M.D.

ALONZO CHRISTOPHER R.N.

DAVITA MEDICAL GROUP CALIFORNIA P.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

GALINDO ALEXIS ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

PASCALE MATTHEW S. ESQ.

ANARI MOJAN

PASCALE MATTHEW STEPHEN ESQ.

SIMPSON VENESSA PEARL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

9/9/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Settlement

7/3/2019: Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

7/3/2019: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Minute Order

3/13/2019: Minute Order

DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/5/2018: DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Answer

10/9/2018: Answer

Answer

10/26/2018: Answer

SUMMONS

5/9/2018: SUMMONS

PLAFNTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SONE-SEERE WILSON, M.D.'S DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/28/2018: PLAFNTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SONE-SEERE WILSON, M.D.'S DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

6/29/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/6/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/10/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/24/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFERRING AND CASE REASSIGNMENT AND DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/26/2018: NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFERRING AND CASE REASSIGNMENT AND DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PTAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

8/13/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PTAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

8/23/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

3/13/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

SUMMONS

2/16/2018: SUMMONS

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause - Hearing (reDismissal Date) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date) of 09/09/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Trina Ross (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Trina Ross (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Trina Ross (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketFIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. BATTERY 2. NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Trina Ross (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Trina Ross (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Trina Ross (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Trina Ross (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. BATTERY 2. NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HEALTH CARE PARTNERS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HEALTHCARE PARTNERS MEDICAL GROUP A COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GALINDO ALEXIS