This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/29/2021 at 16:46:42 (UTC).

TRIEU, STEVE LAM VS ZHAO, YING

Case Summary

On 11/06/2020 TRIEU, STEVE LAM filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ZHAO, YING. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1702

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TRIEU STEVE LAM

Respondent

ZHAO YING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

TRAN QUANG VAN

 

Court Documents

Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

4/1/2021: Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

Declaration - Default FL170

4/1/2021: Declaration - Default FL170

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

4/1/2021: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Judgment

4/9/2021: Judgment

Notice - Entry of Judgment

4/26/2021: Notice - Entry of Judgment

Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record

5/17/2021: Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record

Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record

5/17/2021: Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

1/5/2021: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Proof of Service of Summons

1/5/2021: Proof of Service of Summons

Request - Enter Default FL165 - Mailed to Respondent on 1/5/2021

1/5/2021: Request - Enter Default FL165 - Mailed to Respondent on 1/5/2021

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

11/6/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

11/6/2020: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Summons

11/6/2020: Summons

Notice - Case Assignment

11/6/2020: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

11/6/2020: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - Stipulated; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketStipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165 (Mailed to Respondent on 1/5/2021 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRAN QUANG VAN