This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2019 at 04:14:17 (UTC).

TRICOAST BUILDERS VS. COUNTER POINT PUBLIC ADJUSTING ET.AL.

Case Summary

On 11/01/2017 TRICOAST BUILDERS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against COUNTER POINT PUBLIC ADJUSTING. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8080

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRICOAST BUILDERS INC

Defendants

PACIFIC UNION FINANCIAL LLC

WHITEHOUSE CONSTRUCTION INC.

ADJUSTING COUNTER POINT PUBLIC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CONNETTE MICHAEL T.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F49; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Case Dismissed) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by TRICOAST BUILDERS, INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department F49; (Order ReRelated Cases; OSC Set) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADJUSTING COUNTERPOINT PUBLIC is a litigant

Latest cases where Tricoast Builders, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where PACIFIC UNION FINANCIAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CONNETTE MICHAEL T.