This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/06/2021 at 17:11:02 (UTC).

TRIBEST, INC. VS. TELEWISE, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/20/2017 TRIBEST, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TELEWISE, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NANCY L. NEWMAN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7417

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

NANCY L. NEWMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRIBEST INC.

Defendants

DOES 1-10

TELEWISE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRODKIN ALAN L.

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/18/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Motion re: - MOTION FOR ASSIGNMENT ORDER

6/18/2020: Motion re: - MOTION FOR ASSIGNMENT ORDER

Complaint

4/20/2017: Complaint

Writ - Return - WRIT - RETURN WITH LEVY

4/29/2020: Writ - Return - WRIT - RETURN WITH LEVY

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

2/5/2021: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING

6/22/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ASSIGNMENT ORDER) OF 09/09/2020

9/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ASSIGNMENT ORDER) OF 09/09/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ASSIGNMENT ORDER)

9/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ASSIGNMENT ORDER)

Notice of Ruling

9/14/2020: Notice of Ruling

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/6/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATI...)

7/30/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATI...)

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

8/6/2019: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATI...)

10/15/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATI...)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/20/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

4/20/2017: Summons

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Proof-Service/Summons

5/18/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Proof-Service/Summons

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/27/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Default Entered

7/13/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Default Entered

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2021
  • Hearing05/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appearance and Examination; Filed by Tribest, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Tribest, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Hearing on Motion for Assignment Order - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Assignment Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Assignment Order) of 09/09/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Hearing); Filed by Tribest, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketMotion for Assignment Order; Filed by Tribest, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketWrit - Return (With Levy)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2017
  • DocketDefault Entered (AS TO; TELEWISE,LLC A CALIF. LTD. LIAB. CO.-ENTERED ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default (AS TO; TELEWISE,LLC A CALIFORNIA LTD.LIAB. CO-REJECTED ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Tribest, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Tribest, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Tribest, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Tribest, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****7417    Hearing Date: September 09, 2020    Dept: P

 

Tentative Ruling

Tribest, Inc. v. Telewise, LLC, Case No.****7417

Hearing Date September 9, 2020

Motion for Assignment Order (UNOPPOSED)

Plaintiff obtained judgment against defendant in October 2017. Defendant/judgment creditor conducts business and receives online credit card payments from its website. Plaintiff requests an order assigning all payments from credit card transactions toward satisfaction of the outstanding judgment of $49,865.59.

Pursuant to Cal. Code of Civil Procedure ;708.510, a court may issue an order directing a judgment debtor assign to a judgment creditor all or part of a right to payment due or to become due. Under Section 708.520, the court can restrain a judgment debtor from transferring the right to a payment the judgment creditor seeks to be assigned.

Plaintiff provided evidence that the $49,865.59 judgment is outstanding, and defendant has an ongoing interest in credit card payments. Brodkin motion at ¶¶4,5. The motion is unopposed. GRANTED. Plaintiff is assigned all payments due to defendants received by means of credit card transactions until the outstanding judgment amount is paid.

DUE TO THE ONGOING COVID-19 PANDEMIC, PARTIES AND COUNSEL ARE STRONGLY ENCOURAGED TO AVOID IN-PERSON APPEARANCES AND TO APPEAR REMOTELY. LA COURT CONNECT IS NOW AVAILABLE.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TELEWISE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRODKIN ALAN