This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/01/2022 at 00:09:55 (UTC).

TRI CITY ESCROWS, INC. VS POWER BROKERS INTERNATIONAL, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/31/2020 TRI CITY ESCROWS, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against POWER BROKERS INTERNATIONAL, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MALCOLM MACKEY. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8953

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MALCOLM MACKEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRI CITY ESCROWS INC.

Defendants

POWER BROKERS INTERNATIONAL INC.

CASSILLY BARRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHACHTER ROBERT

Defendant Attorney

BOJIC PAUL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/31/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/31/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/31/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/31/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/1/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/28/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/11/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 12/11/2020

12/11/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 12/11/2020

Answer

12/10/2020: Answer

Case Management Statement

12/8/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF FUTURE HEARING DATES

12/21/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF FUTURE HEARING DATES

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

2/25/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/22/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER FOR COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION TO ENFORCE TERMS OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ETC.

4/22/2021: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER FOR COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION TO ENFORCE TERMS OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ETC.

Request for Dismissal

4/22/2021: Request for Dismissal

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketStipulation - No Order (for Court to Retain Jurisdiction to Enforce Terms of Settlement Agreement etc.); Filed by Tri City Escrows, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Tri City Escrows, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Tri City Escrows, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF FUTURE HEARING DATES); Filed by Tri City Escrows, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 12/11/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Power Brokers International, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Tri City Escrows, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Tri City Escrows, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Tri City Escrows, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Tri City Escrows, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Tri City Escrows, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRI CITY ESCROWS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where POWER BROKERS INTERNATIONAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHACHTER ROBERT