This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2019 at 04:39:45 (UTC).

TREVOR SELKIRK VS GRASSHOPPER HOUSE LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/14/2018 TREVOR SELKIRK filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against GRASSHOPPER HOUSE LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6281

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner, Respondent and Appellant

SELKIRK TREVOR

Defendants, Respondents and Appellants

PASSAGES MALIBU

PASSAGES VENTURA

PASSAGES SILVER STRAND LLC

PRENTISS PAX

SELKIRK TREVOR

GRASSHOPPER HOUSE LLC

PRENTISS CHRIS

VENTURA PASSAGES

MALIBU PASSAGES

GRASSHOPPER HOUSE LLC DBA PASSAGES MALIBU AND PASSAGES VENTURA

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SMITH-AIMAN RANDALL B.

Appellant Attorney

LEVIN JASON ESQ.

Respondent Attorney

AIMAN-SMITH RANDALL BRUCE

 

Court Documents

CIVIL DEPOSIT

7/16/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

DECLARATION OF ALEXANDRA M. STEINBERG IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION REGARDING DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/30/2018: DECLARATION OF ALEXANDRA M. STEINBERG IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION REGARDING DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

8/3/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Minute Order

8/7/2018: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/16/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY-CIVIL

9/4/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY-CIVIL

Declaration

10/4/2018: Declaration

Ex Parte Application

10/5/2018: Ex Parte Application

Notice

10/12/2018: Notice

Opposition

11/1/2018: Opposition

Reply

11/8/2018: Reply

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

11/15/2018: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

12/12/2018: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed

12/17/2018: Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed

Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter

12/26/2018: Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter

Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal

1/14/2019: Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal

SUMMONS

5/14/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. FRAUD BY MISREPRESENTATION ;ETC

5/14/2018: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. FRAUD BY MISREPRESENTATION ;ETC

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2019
  • Status Report (Joint Status Conference Statement); Filed by Grasshopper House, LLC (Defendant); Passages Silver Strand, LLC (Defendant); Chris Prentiss (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Appeal Record Delivered; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid (PAID FOR APPELLANT); Filed by Trevor Selkirk (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Grasshopper House, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Notice of Default (NOA 1/7/19); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (for Cross-Appeal, filed 1/7/19); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Grasshopper House, LLC (Defendant); Passages Malibu (Legacy Party); Passages Ventura (Legacy Party) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by Trevor Selkirk (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed; Filed by Trevor Selkirk (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2018
  • Declaration; Filed by Grasshopper House, LLC (Defendant); Passages Malibu (Legacy Party); Passages Ventura (Legacy Party) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Receipt; Filed by Trevor Selkirk (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Trevor Selkirk (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. FRAUD BY MISREPRESENTATION; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. FRAUD BY MISREPRESENTATION ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Trevor Selkirk (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC706281    Hearing Date: December 27, 2019    Dept: 47

Trevor Selkirk, et al. v. Grasshopper House, LLC, d/b/a Passages Malibu and Passages Ventura

 

DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

MOVING PARTY: Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC d/b/a Passages Malibu and Passages Ventura, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss and Pax Prentiss

RESPONDING PARTY(S): Plaintiff Trevor Selkirk and Dan Rescigno

STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS AND/OR PROCEEDINGS:

Plaintiffs allege that Defendants have engaged in false advertising in connection with their alcohol and drug addiction rehabilitation facilities.

Defendants demur to the first amended complaint (“1AC”).

TENTATIVE RULING:

The hearing on Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC d/b/a Passages Malibu and Passages Ventura, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, and Pax Prentiss’s demurrer to the first amended complaint is CONTINUED to June 26, 2020.

On November 15, 2018, the Court partially denied the anti-SLAPP special motion to strike brought by Defendants Grasshopper House, LLC d/b/a Passages Malibu and Passages Ventura, Passages Silver Strand, LLC, Chris Prentiss, and Pax Prentiss. Defendants filed a notice of appeal from the Court’s order, and Plaintiffs filed a notice of cross-appeal. Trial court proceedings on the merits are automatically stayed pending an appeal from the denial of an anti-SLAPP motion. (Varian Medical Systems, Inc. v. Delfino (2005) 35 Cal.4th 180, 191.)

The parties have informed the Court that the appeal is still pending. Accordingly, it is appropriate for the action to remain stayed and for this demurrer to be continued to the above date, as of which the appeal may be resolved.

Defendants to give notice, unless waived.

IT IS SO ORDERED.

Dated: December 27, 2019 ___________________________________

Randolph M. Hammock

Judge of the Superior Court

Any party may submit on the tentative ruling by contacting the courtroom via email at Smcdept47@lacourt.org