This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/04/2019 at 17:53:46 (UTC).

TREVOR JOHNSON VS RENAUD'S BAKER AND BISTRO, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/02/2019 TREVOR JOHNSON filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against RENAUD'S BAKER AND BISTRO, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CAROLYN B. KUHL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5046

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CAROLYN B. KUHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHNSON TREVOR

Defendant

RENAUD'S BAKER AND BISTRO INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AIWAZIAN EDWIN

Defendant Attorney

MILLER JONATHAN D.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION)

10/8/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION) OF 10/08/2019

10/8/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION) OF 10/08/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION)

10/8/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/2/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/2/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

10/2/2019: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/2/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/30/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Mail

10/30/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

11/18/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

11/14/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2020
  • Hearing01/03/2020 at 10:00 AM in Department 12 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Initial Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketOrder (Granting stipulation extending time to respond to complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketStipulation to Continue Initial Status Conference; Filed by Renaud's Baker and Bistro, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketStipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint; Filed by Renaud's Baker and Bistro, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Trevor Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Trevor Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • Docketat 2:10 PM in Department 12, Carolyn B. Kuhl, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER REGARDING NEWLY FILED CLASS ACTION) of 10/08/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Trevor Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Trevor Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLER JONATHAN DENGLER