Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2021 at 22:33:36 (UTC).

TRENT MAZUR VS VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC., A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 TRENT MAZUR filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC , A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3883

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAZUR TRENT

Defendant

VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA INC. A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROMANO MARK

Defendant Attorney

SHARPLESS KATHERINE A.

 

Court Documents

Answer

5/17/2021: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE)

5/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE)

Proof of Personal Service

4/22/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

4/15/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR DEPARTMENT 69 ONLINE COURTROOM INFORMATION

4/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR DEPARTMENT 69 ONLINE COURTROOM INFORMATION

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/15/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/13/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2021
  • Hearing08/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • Docketat 1:55 PM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Order to Show Cause)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Trent Mazur (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Department 69 Online Courtroom Information); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Trent Mazur (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Trent Mazur (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Trent Mazur (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Volkswagen Group America, Inc. is a litigant