Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2021 at 15:50:37 (UTC).

TRAVIS WILSON VS KETCHAM AUTO WORKS, INC., AN UNKNOWN BUSINESS ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/21/2020 TRAVIS WILSON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KETCHAM AUTO WORKS, INC , AN UNKNOWN BUSINESS ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9367

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILSON TRAVIS

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

FONTENOT TOWING INC.

KETCHAM AUTO WORKS INC. AN UNKNOWN BUSINESS ENTITY

PUGH JESSE E.

Cross Defendant

ROES 1-15

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YAGHOUBIAN BABAK BOBBY

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LUHRING SUSAN E.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Firm Name

11/2/2020: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Answer

7/9/2020: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

7/9/2020: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

7/9/2020: Cross-Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/9/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Related Case

7/9/2020: Notice of Related Case

Complaint

5/21/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/21/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

5/28/2020: PI General Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2023
  • Hearing05/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • Hearing11/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • Hearing11/04/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by KETCHAM AUTO WORKS, INC., an Unknown Business Entity (Defendant); FONTENOT TOWING, Inc. (Defendant); Jesse E. Pugh (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by KETCHAM AUTO WORKS, INC., an Unknown Business Entity (Defendant); FONTENOT TOWING, Inc. (Defendant); Jesse E. Pugh (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by KETCHAM AUTO WORKS, INC., an Unknown Business Entity (Defendant); FONTENOT TOWING, Inc. (Defendant); Jesse E. Pugh (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by KETCHAM AUTO WORKS, INC., an Unknown Business Entity (Defendant); FONTENOT TOWING, Inc. (Defendant); Jesse E. Pugh (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by KETCHAM AUTO WORKS, INC., an Unknown Business Entity (Defendant); FONTENOT TOWING, Inc. (Defendant); Jesse E. Pugh (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by KETCHAM AUTO WORKS, INC., an Unknown Business Entity (Defendant); FONTENOT TOWING, Inc. (Defendant); Jesse E. Pugh (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Travis Wilson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Travis Wilson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Travis Wilson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FONTENOT TOWING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YAGHOUBIAN BABAK BOBBY