This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2022 at 18:38:59 (UTC).

TRAVIS SHEFFIELD VS SINANIAN DEVELOPMENT, INC., DBA SINANIAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/05/2020 TRAVIS SHEFFIELD filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SINANIAN DEVELOPMENT, INC , DBA SINANIAN,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8946

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHEFFIELD TRAVIS

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

LA MAIN AFFILIATES LLC.

SINANIAN DEVELOPMENT INC. DBA SINANIAN

FIVE STAR PLASTERING INC. DOE 1

CALIFORNIA ACCESS SCAFFOLD DOE 2

Cross Defendants

CALIFORNIA ACCESS SCAFFOLD

FIVE STAR PLASTERING. INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GHERMEZIAN RAYMOND

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

PALTA AMIT

 

Court Documents

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

5/18/2022: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

5/18/2022: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

5/18/2022: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY"))

6/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY"))

Declaration - DECLARATION OF RAYMOND GHERMEZIAN IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL

7/25/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF RAYMOND GHERMEZIAN IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...)

7/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...)

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

12/30/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

5/25/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

5/11/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

5/11/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

4/2/2020: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

4/2/2020: Cross-Complaint

Answer

4/2/2020: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/12/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/17/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

PI General Order

3/12/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

3/12/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/5/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2023
  • Hearing03/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • Hearing11/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • Hearing10/20/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 27; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (OF RAYMOND GHERMEZIAN IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL); Filed by Travis Sheffield (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion (PLAINTIFF TRAVIS SHEFFIELD?S RESPONSE TO SPECIALLY PREPARED INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF AMIT PALTA; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS OF $572.00 AGAINST PLAINTIFF); Filed by Sinanian Development, Inc. (Defendant); LA Main Affiliates, LLC Erroneously Sued As LA Main Affiliates, LLC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Sinanian Development, Inc. (Defendant); LA Main Affiliates, LLC Erroneously Sued As LA Main Affiliates, LLC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Travis Sheffield (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Travis Sheffield (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Travis Sheffield (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Travis Sheffield (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Travis Sheffield (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******8946 Hearing Date: July 28, 2022 Dept: 27

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

TRAVIS SHEFFIELD,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

SINANIAN DEVELOPMENT, INC., et al.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

) )

)

CASE NO.: *******8946

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: DEFENDANT SINANIAN DEVELOPMENT, INC. dba SINANIAN AND LA MAIN AFFILIATES, LLC’S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF’S RESPONSES TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY

Dept. 27

1:30 p.m.

July 28, 2022

On March 5, 2020, plaintiff Travis Sheffield (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against defendant Sinanian Development, Inc. dba Sinanian and LA Main Affiliates, LLC (collectively, “Defendants”) arising from a June 28, 2017, trip and fall. On March 3, 2022, Defendants served Demand for Identification and Inspection of Documents (Set One) and Specially Prepared Interrogatories (Set One) on Plaintiff. No responses were received. On April 22, 2022, Defendants sent Plaintiff a letter requesting responses. Defendants did not receive a response and filed these two motions on May 18, 2022.

Where a party fails to serve timely responses to discovery requests, the court may make an order compelling responses. (Code Civ. Proc., 2030.290, 2031.300; Healthcare Consulting, Inc. v. Pacific Healthcare Consultants (2007) 148 Cal.App.4th 390, 403.) A party that fails to serve timely responses waives any objections to the request, including ones based on privilege or the protection of attorney work product. (Code Civ. Proc., 2030.290, subd. (a), 2031.300, subd. (a).)

Plaintiff did not oppose either motion and it is undisputed responses were not served. Defendants’ motions are GRANTED and Plaintiff is ordered to serve verified responses without objections to Defendants’ Demand for Identification and Inspection of Documents (Set One) and Specially Prepared Interrogatories (Set One), within 10 days of the date of this Order.

The Code of Civil Procedure provides that the court shall impose a monetary sanction against the party who unsuccessfully makes or opposes a motion to compel, unless the party acted with substantial justification or the sanction would otherwise be unjust. (Code Civ. Proc., 2030.290, subd. (c), 2031.300, subd. (c).) The Court finds evidence of neither.

Defendants’ request for monetary sanctions is GRANTED and imposed against Plaintiff and counsel of record, jointly and severally, in the reduced amount of $458.00 for 2 hours at defense counsel’s hourly rate of $169.00 and $120.00 in filing fees, to be paid within 10 days of the date of this Order.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org. Please be advised that if you submit on the tentative and elect not to appear at the hearing, the opposing party may nevertheless appear at the hearing and argue the matter. Unless you receive a submission from all other parties in the matter, you should assume that others might appear at the hearing to argue. If the Court does not receive emails from the parties indicating submission on this tentative ruling and there are no appearances at the hearing, the Court may, at its discretion, adopt the tentative as the final order or place the motion off calendar.



Case Number: *******8946 Hearing Date: June 13, 2022 Dept: 27

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

TRAVIS SHEFFIELD,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

SINANIAN DEVELOPMENT, INC., et al.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

) )

)

CASE NO.: *******8946

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: DEFENDANT SINANIAN DEVELOPMENT, INC. dba SINANIAN AND LA MAIN AFFILIATES, LLC’S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF’S RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

Dept. 27

1:30 p.m.

June 13, 2022

On March 5, 2020, plaintiff Travis Sheffield (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against defendant Sinanian Development, Inc. dba Sinanian and LA Main Affiliates, LLC (collectively, “Defendants”) arising from a June 28, 2017, trip and fall. On March 3, 2022, Defendants served Form Interrogatories (Set One) on Plaintiff. No responses were received. On April 22, 2022, Defendants sent Plaintiff a letter requesting responses. Defendants did not receive a response and filed this motion on May 18, 2022.

Where a party fails to serve timely responses to discovery requests, the court may make an order compelling responses. (Code Civ. Proc., 2030.290, 2031.300; Healthcare Consulting, Inc. v. Pacific Healthcare Consultants (2007) 148 Cal.App.4th 390, 403.) A party that fails to serve timely responses waives any objections to the request, including ones based on privilege or the protection of attorney work product. (Code Civ. Proc., 2030.290, subd. (a), 2031.300, subd. (a).)

Plaintiff did not oppose the Motion and it is undisputed responses were not served. Defendants’ Motion is GRANTED and Plaintiff is ordered to serve verified responses without objections to Defendants’ Form Interrogatories (Set One), within 10 days of the date of this Order.

The Code of Civil Procedure provides that the court shall impose a monetary sanction against the party who unsuccessfully makes or opposes a motion to compel, unless the party acted with substantial justification or the sanction would otherwise be unjust. (Code Civ. Proc., 2030.290, subd. (c), 2031.300, subd. (c).) The Court finds evidence of neither. Sanctions may be awarded under in favor of a party who files a motion to compel discovery, even though the requested discovery was provided to the moving party after the motion was filed. (C.R.C. 3.1348.)

Defendants’ request for monetary sanctions is GRANTED and imposed against Plaintiff and counsel of record, jointly and severally, in the reduced amount of $229.00 for 1 hour at defense counsel’s hourly rate of $169.00 and $60.00 in filing fees, to be paid within 10 days of the date of this Order.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org. Please be advised that if you submit on the tentative and elect not to appear at the hearing, the opposing party may nevertheless appear at the hearing and argue the matter. Unless you receive a submission from all other parties in the matter, you should assume that others might appear at the hearing to argue. If the Court does not receive emails from the parties indicating submission on this tentative ruling and there are no appearances at the hearing, the Court may, at its discretion, adopt the tentative as the final order or place the motion off calendar.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Five Star Plastering, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where LA MAIN AFFILIATES LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases where California Access Scaffold, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SINANIAN DEVELOPMENT INC is a litigant