This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/15/2023 at 17:38:11 (UTC).

TRAVIS PARKER VS MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 TRAVIS PARKER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2751

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARKER TRAVIS

Defendant

MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSENTHAL BRETT L. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

LOWELL REBECCA BLACKSTONE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/3/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/3/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

9/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

9/28/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/28/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/24/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

11/24/2021: Answer

Declaration - DECLARATION REGARDING DESIGNATION OF TRIAL COUNSEL

11/24/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION REGARDING DESIGNATION OF TRIAL COUNSEL

Demand for Jury Trial

11/24/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Request for Dismissal

11/17/2021: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

10/12/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/29/2022

12/29/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/29/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

12/29/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Settlement

12/29/2022: Notice of Settlement

Request for Dismissal

4/17/2023: Request for Dismissal

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 05/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/19/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Travis Parker on 09/03/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Travis Parker as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Travis Parker (Plaintiff); As to: Mission Community Hospital (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 05/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: Travis Parker (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 12/29/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Final Status Conference scheduled for 02/17/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 12/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 12/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 12/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Summons on Complaint], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Travis Parker (Plaintiff); As to: Mission Community Hospital (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/17/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Travis Parker (Plaintiff); As to: Mission Community Hospital (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Travis Parker (Plaintiff); As to: Mission Community Hospital (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less