This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/14/2020 at 00:57:56 (UTC).

TRAVIS DULIN VS TOYOTA ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/28/2018 TRAVIS DULIN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TOYOTA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE and EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6585

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

DULIN TRAVIS

Defendants and Respondents

TOYOTA MOTOR NORTH AMERICA INC.

DOES 1 TO 100 INCLUSIVE

TULUMIS CHRISTINA

TOYOTA MOTOR SALES USA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

GEOULLA DANIEL D. ESQ.

GEOULLA DANIEL DANNY ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

ENDRES RICHARD STEPHEN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/26/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

8/5/2020: Notice of Settlement

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND MSJ HEARING DATE

6/19/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND MSJ HEARING DATE

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND MSJ HEARING DATE

6/29/2020: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND MSJ HEARING DATE

Notice of Ruling

6/29/2020: Notice of Ruling

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND MSJ HEARING

3/27/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND MSJ HEARING

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/18/2020

3/18/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/18/2020

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE DEFENDANT'S MSJ HEARING AND MSJ OPPOSITION DUE DATE

2/5/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE DEFENDANT'S MSJ HEARING AND MSJ OPPOSITION DUE DATE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE DEFENDANT'S MSJ H...)

2/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE DEFENDANT'S MSJ H...)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DATE AND CORRESPONDING OPPOSITION AND REPLY DATES

1/31/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DATE AND CORRESPONDING OPPOSITION AND REPLY DATES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

11/27/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DAVID BERKE ISO MSJ

9/30/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DAVID BERKE ISO MSJ

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF PAMELA BOYD IO MSJ

9/30/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF PAMELA BOYD IO MSJ

Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL PROOF OF SERVICE RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U.S.A., INC. AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS

10/4/2019: Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL PROOF OF SERVICE RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U.S.A., INC. AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS

ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS TOYOTA MOTOR NORTH AMERICA, INC. AND CHRISTINA TULUMIS TO THE UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF TRAVIS DULIN

9/12/2018: ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS TOYOTA MOTOR NORTH AMERICA, INC. AND CHRISTINA TULUMIS TO THE UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF TRAVIS DULIN

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

5/28/2019: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Separate Statement

5/28/2019: Separate Statement

CoverSheet -

2/28/2018: CoverSheet -

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Travis Dulin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Travis Dulin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial, All Pretrial Deadlines, Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing and All Motion for Summary Judgment Deadlines) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial, All Pretri...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Travis Dulin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketOrder ([Proposed] Order Granting Stipulation to Continue Trial and MSJ Hearing Date); Filed by Toyota Motor North America, Inc. (Defendant); Christina Tulumis (Defendant); Toyota Motor Sales, USA, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketEx Parte Application (to Continue Trial, All Pretrial Deadlines, Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing and All Motion for Summary Judgment Deadlines); Filed by Travis Dulin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketMotion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Filed by Christina Tulumis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketSeparate Statement; Filed by Christina Tulumis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Toyota Motor North America, Inc. (Defendant); Christina Tulumis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Travis Dulin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Toyota Motor North America, Inc. (Defendant); Christina Tulumis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketANSWER OF DEFENDANTS TOYOTA MOTOR NORTH AMERICA, INC. AND CHRISTINA TULUMIS TO THE UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF TRAVIS DULIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Travis Dulin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Travis Dulin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC696585    Hearing Date: November 27, 2019    Dept: 4B

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

On February 2, 2018, plaintiff Travis Dulin filed this action against defendants Toyota, Toyota Motor North America, Inc., and Christina Tulumis. Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. was added as a Doe defendant. The trial date is currently set for January 21, 2020. Defendants and Plaintiff request a trial continuance to June 15, 2020, with all motion and discovery-cut off dates to be based upon the new trial date. Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. asks to continue the date for its summary judgment motion as well.

A party seeking a continuance of the date set for trial must make the request for a continuance by a noticed motion or an ex parte application as soon as reasonably practical once the necessity for the continuance is discovered. (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 3.1332(b).) The request for continuance may be granted on an affirmative showing of good cause. (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 3.1332.)

Based on the evidence submitted, the Court finds good cause to continue the trial. Defendant’s motion to continue trial is GRANTED. Trial is continued to June 18, 2020. The Final Status Conference is scheduled for June 4, 2020. All discovery and motion cut-off dates are based on the new trial date. The summary judgment hearing date is continued from December 24, 2019 to February 21, 2020.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.