Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2019 at 01:11:16 (UTC).

TRAVELERS CASUALTY & SURETY VS. BASIC HOLDINGS, ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/04/2018 TRAVELERS CASUALTY SURETY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BASIC HOLDINGS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RAMONA G. SEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2584

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RAMONA G. SEE

 

Party Details

Defendants

BRAVO LOGISTICS LLC A LIMITED...

OHARE FREIGHT USA INC. A CORPORATION

SSA-COOPER LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY...

JBJ TRUCKING SERVICE INCORPORATED ...

PORT CITY LOGISTICS TRANSPORTATION ...

DMJ TRUCKING LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY...

SPECIAL EVENT TRANSPORTATION INC. ...

DAILY EXPRESS INC. A CORPORATION

A & R EXPRESS AN ENTITY OF UNKNOWN...

TOP FLY LOGISTICS LLC. A LIMITED...

LARSEN INTERMODAL SERVICES INC. A...

TURBO EXPRESS INC. A CORPORATION

TEJEDA TRUCKING INC. A CORPORATION

MORRIS TRUCKING CORP. A CORPORATION

G G TRUCK LINES INC. A CORPORATION

SNOWWOLVES TRANSPORT INC. A CORPORATION

SUMMIT EXPRESS INC. A CORPORATION

EXPRESS CARGO INC. A CORPORATION

SHERWAY LOGISTICS INC. A CORPORATION

KANSAS CITY INTERMODAL LLC A LIMITED...

297 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

GOODMAN & HECHT

HUSCH BLACKWELL LLP

ROBERTS & KEHAGIARAS

RODNEY S DIGGS ESQ.

DIGGS RODNEY SEAN

KEHAGIARAS ANDREW DEMETRIOS

Other Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF HAUSMAN & SOSA LLP

SOSA CARLOS EDUARDO

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/6/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/6/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

3/15/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/27/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/27/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/4/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/22/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Case Management Statement

5/30/2019: Case Management Statement

Legacy Document

5/17/2018: Legacy Document

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/1/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/1/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/1/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Affidavit

6/13/2018: Affidavit

Summons

6/22/2018: Summons

Summons

6/25/2018: Summons

Summons

6/25/2018: Summons

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

8/27/2018: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

6/27/2018: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

392 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company... (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service (of First Amended Summon); Filed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company... (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Request for Entry of Default; Filed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company... (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service (of Frist Amened Summon); Filed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company... (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Notice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company... (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department M; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department M; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Rodney Sean Diggs (Attorney); TRUCK LOGISTICS SERVICES INC., A CORP... (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
658 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-03-13 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Declaration; Filed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company... (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company... (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company... (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company... (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company... (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company... (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2008
  • Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TURBO EXPRESS INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOSA, CARLOS E