This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/27/2020 at 00:58:06 (UTC).

TRAN SAN VS WELLS FARGO HOME MORTGAGE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 TRAN SAN filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against WELLS FARGO HOME MORTGAGE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT B. BROADBELT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6070

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAN TRAN

Defendants

WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.

CAL WESTERN RECONVEYANCE CORPORATION

WELLS FARGO HOME MORTGAGE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

2/18/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/18/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

2/18/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/25/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

5/4/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

5/4/2020: Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

9/17/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Tran San (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Tran San (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WELLS FARGO HOME MORTGAGE is a litigant

Latest cases where CAL-WESTERN RECONVEYANCE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant