This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/02/2023 at 04:21:53 (UTC).

TRACY TAYLOR VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Case Summary

On 05/04/2021 TRACY TAYLOR filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6771

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAYLOR TRACY

Defendant

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TASHNIZI PAUL P.

Defendant Attorney

WILLIS KIMBERLY RACHELLE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/4/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/4/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/4/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

5/25/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

5/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Answer

7/15/2021: Answer

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

3/9/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

9/21/2022: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Request for Dismissal

4/18/2023: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 07/12/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/19/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/19/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 04/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/19/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Tracy Taylor on 05/04/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Tracy Taylor as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Tracy Taylor (Plaintiff); As to: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Signed and Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant); As to: Tracy Taylor (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Final Status Conference scheduled for 10/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 07/12/2023 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 07/26/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketAddress for Paul P. Tashnizi (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Tracy Taylor (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order]; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 10/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 04/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Tracy Taylor (Plaintiff); As to: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Tracy Taylor (Plaintiff); As to: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Tracy Taylor (Plaintiff); As to: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less