This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2021 at 14:02:20 (UTC).

TRACY SHORT VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/17/2021 TRACY SHORT filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ANN I. JONES, DANIEL J. BUCKLEY and DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6317

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ANN I. JONES

DANIEL J. BUCKLEY

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHORT TRACY

Defendants

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FOX DAVID ADAM

SIEGLOCK CHRISTOPHER CHARLES

ADLER ENRIQUE ELLIOT

 

Court Documents

Complaint

2/17/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 03/01/2021

3/1/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 03/01/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

3/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

Notice of Add-on to JCCP Petition

4/26/2021: Notice of Add-on to JCCP Petition

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RE: TWENTY-SECOND PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASES

5/19/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RE: TWENTY-SECOND PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (RYE FIRE CASES); STATUS CONFERENCE (RYE FI...)

6/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (RYE FIRE CASES); STATUS CONFERENCE (RYE FI...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

6/18/2021: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

10/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

11/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

11/30/2021: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

11/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2022
  • Hearing01/12/2022 at 3:00 PM in Department 1 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • Docketat 4:40 PM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • Docketat 4:00 PM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Status Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 1, Daniel J. Buckley, Presiding; Informal Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Order Re: Twenty-Second Petition for Coordination of Add-On Cases); Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketOrder Re: Twenty-Second Petition for Coordination of Add-On Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Add-on to JCCP Petition; Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • Docketat 11:49 AM in Department 11, David S. Cunningham, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of 03/01/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Tracy Short (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Tracy Short (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EDISON INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FOX DAVID ADAM

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIEGLOCK CHRISTOPHER C.