This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/27/2021 at 05:48:12 (UTC).

TRACY CUI VS SNOW JOE LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/14/2021 TRACY CUI filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against SNOW JOE LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JILL FEENEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8257

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JILL FEENEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CUI TRACY

Defendants

SNOW JOE LLC

HOME DEPOT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RYAN ANDREW T.

Defendant Attorneys

DIXON ROBERT KENNETH

SCHIRM BARRY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/14/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/14/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

5/28/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

5/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Answer

6/25/2021: Answer

Answer

6/25/2021: Answer

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

8/12/2021: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Other - - OTHER - LETTER OF TRANSMITTAL-REMAND

11/19/2021: Other - - OTHER - LETTER OF TRANSMITTAL-REMAND

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: REMAND OF ACTION FROM FEDERAL COURT TO THE LO...) OF 11/19/2021

11/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: REMAND OF ACTION FROM FEDERAL COURT TO THE LO...) OF 11/19/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: REMAND OF ACTION FROM FEDERAL COURT TO THE LO...)

11/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: REMAND OF ACTION FROM FEDERAL COURT TO THE LO...)

Other - - OTHER - CIVIL MINUTES-GENERAL US DISTRICT COURT

11/19/2021: Other - - OTHER - CIVIL MINUTES-GENERAL US DISTRICT COURT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2024
  • Hearing05/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • Hearing11/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • Hearing10/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • Hearing03/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • Docketat 3:15 PM in Department 30, Jill Feeney, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketOther - (Letter of Transmittal-Remand); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Remand of Action from Federal Court to the Lo...) of 11/19/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Remand of Action from Federal Court to the Lo...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketOther - (Civil Minutes-General US District Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by Snow Joe LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Snow Joe LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by HOME DEPOT, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Tracy Cui (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Tracy Cui (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Tracy Cui (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SNOW LAW CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where HOME DEPOT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RYAN ANDREW T.