This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2022 at 12:22:47 (UTC).

TRACI LYN WETZEL, AN INDIVIDUAL VS ANTELOPE VALLEY HOSPITAL, A PUBLIC ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/02/2021 TRACI LYN WETZEL, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ANTELOPE VALLEY HOSPITAL, A PUBLIC ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WENDY CHANG and MICHAEL C. KELLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0247

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WENDY CHANG

MICHAEL C. KELLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WETZEL AN INDIVIDUAL TRACI LYN

Defendants

ANTELOPE VALLEY HEALTHCARE DISTRICT A PUBLIC ENTITY

ANTELOPE VALLEY HOSPITAL A PUBLIC ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GENISH JONATHAN M

Defendant Attorney

DANDAMUDI KAPIL P.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/28/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

3/3/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/30/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/2/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

6/7/2021: Answer

Motion to Compel Arbitration

7/9/2021: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Case Management Statement

7/16/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/16/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/16/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/28/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

8/6/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Objection - OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF LIZ SALAZAR

8/6/2021: Objection - OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF LIZ SALAZAR

Declaration - DECLARATION OF TRACI LYN WETZEL IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

8/6/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF TRACI LYN WETZEL IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS ANTELOPE VALLEY HOSPITAL AND ANTELOPE VALLEY HEALTHCARE DISTRICT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

8/12/2021: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS ANTELOPE VALLEY HOSPITAL AND ANTELOPE VALLEY HEALTHCARE DISTRICT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; CASE MANAGEMENT CONF...)

8/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; CASE MANAGEMENT CONF...)

Proof of Personal Service

4/21/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/21/2021: Proof of Personal Service

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2022
  • Hearing12/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • Hearing12/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Case Reassignment); Filed by TRACI LYN WETZEL, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by ANTELOPE VALLEY HOSPITAL, a public entity (Defendant); ANTELOPE VALLEY HEALTHCARE DISTRICT, a public entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Michael C. Kelley, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Michael C. Kelley, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration; Case Management Conf...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketReply (Defendants Antelope Valley Hospital and Antelope Valley Healthcare District's Motion to Compel Arbitration); Filed by ANTELOPE VALLEY HOSPITAL, a public entity (Defendant); ANTELOPE VALLEY HEALTHCARE DISTRICT, a public entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by TRACI LYN WETZEL, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by TRACI LYN WETZEL, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by ANTELOPE VALLEY HOSPITAL, a public entity (Defendant); ANTELOPE VALLEY HEALTHCARE DISTRICT, a public entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by ANTELOPE VALLEY HOSPITAL, a public entity (Defendant); ANTELOPE VALLEY HEALTHCARE DISTRICT, a public entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by TRACI LYN WETZEL, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by TRACI LYN WETZEL, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by TRACI LYN WETZEL, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by TRACI LYN WETZEL, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by TRACI LYN WETZEL, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANTELOPE VALLEY HEALTHCARE DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where ANTELOPE VALLEY HEALTHCARE DISTRICT DBA ANTELOPE VALLEY HOSPITAL is a litigant