This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/23/2019 at 00:03:09 (UTC).

TRACEY BUCKNER VS LANDRYS PAYROLL INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/10/2018 TRACEY BUCKNER filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against LANDRYS PAYROLL INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERRY A. GREEN and TERRY GREEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3529

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

TERRY A. GREEN

TERRY GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BUCKNER TRACEY

Respondents and Defendants

LANDRY'S PAYROLL INC.

BULLOCK GERALD

ARTIE MORTON'S OF CHICAGO/FIGUEROA LLC

DOES 1 TO 10

MOODY KRYSTAL

MORTON'S RESTAURANT GROUP INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

RICHIE LITIGATION P.C.

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

LYNCH MARY E. ESQ.

Attorney at Lynch, Mary E., Law Offices of

100 Spectrum Center Drive, Suite 420

Irvine, CA 92618

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

8/21/2019: Minute Order

Status Report

6/11/2019: Status Report

Status Report

3/12/2019: Status Report

DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE ON MOI[ON TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, OR. IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY THE MATTER UNTIL THE CURRENT HEARING DATE

9/20/2018: DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE ON MOI[ON TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, OR. IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STAY THE MATTER UNTIL THE CURRENT HEARING DATE

ORDER ADVANCING DEFENDANTS? NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

9/20/2018: ORDER ADVANCING DEFENDANTS? NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Minute Order

9/20/2018: Minute Order

Request for Dismissal

11/6/2018: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

11/7/2018: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Case Management Statement

11/20/2018: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/20/2018: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order

12/12/2018: Minute Order

Stipulation and Order

11/21/2018: Stipulation and Order

Certificate of Mailing for

12/12/2018: Certificate of Mailing for

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/19/2018: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORJTIES IN SUPPORT; AND DECLARATIONS OF LAURA JASSO, AND MARY E. LYNCH IN SUPPORT THEREOF

9/6/2018: DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORJTIES IN SUPPORT; AND DECLARATIONS OF LAURA JASSO, AND MARY E. LYNCH IN SUPPORT THEREOF

DEFENDANTS' APPENDIX OF NONCALIFORNIA AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

9/6/2018: DEFENDANTS' APPENDIX OF NONCALIFORNIA AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/27/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • Hearingat 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Arbitration Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketStatus Report; Filed by Tracey Buckner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketStatus Report; Filed by Tracey Buckner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 12/12/2018); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration (-Off Calendar (Stip/Ord Filed 11/27/18)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Tracey Buckner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Tracey Buckner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Tracey Buckner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. RACIAL DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF CALIFORNIA FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING ACT ("FEHA" GOV. CODE 12900 ET SEQ.); ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARNIE MORTON'S OF CHICAGO/FIGUEROA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LANDRY'S PAYROLL, INC. is a litigant