This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/09/2019 at 06:46:27 (UTC).

TOWN & COUNTRY INVESTMENTS, LP VS JOE BAKER, ET AL.,

Case Summary

On 09/25/2017 TOWN COUNTRY INVESTMENTS, LP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JOE BAKER, . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LISA HART COLE, NANCY L. NEWMAN and BOBBI TILLMON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8132

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LISA HART COLE

NANCY L. NEWMAN

BOBBI TILLMON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Appellant and Cross Defendant

TOWN & COUNTRY INVESTMENTS LP

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Respondents

COWBOY JOE'S SPORTS SALOON INC.

MUNOZ MINERVA

DIAMOND B. RANCH ENT.

BAKER JOE

KING CITY ENTERTAINMENT INC.

ENT. DIAMOND B. RANCH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

VIVOLI MICHAEL W.

FEDERICI MICHAEL LOUIS

SACCUZZO JASON PAUL

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF ANDREW D. WEISS

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

WEISS ANDREW D.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/25/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

9/25/2017: Summons

Complaint

9/25/2017: Complaint

Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.

10/18/2017: Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.

Minute Order

10/18/2017: Minute Order

Unknown

10/18/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/18/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/18/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/18/2017: Unknown

Undertaking

10/30/2017: Undertaking

Undertaking

10/30/2017: Undertaking

Undertaking

10/30/2017: Undertaking

Undertaking

10/30/2017: Undertaking

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

11/21/2017: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

11/21/2017: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

11/21/2017: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Unknown

11/21/2017: Unknown

Unknown

11/21/2017: Unknown

178 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid; Filed by TOWN & COUNTRY INVESTMENTS, LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103; Filed by TOWN & COUNTRY INVESTMENTS, LP (Appellant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution; Filed by Minerva Munoz (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103; Filed by TOWN & COUNTRY INVESTMENTS, LP (Appellant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketNotice (Respondent's Notice Electing to Use an Appendix); Filed by KING CITY ENTERTAINMENT INC. (Respondent); Minerva Munoz (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed; Filed by TOWN & COUNTRY INVESTMENTS, LP (Appellant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketMotion for Attorney Fees; Filed by Minerva Munoz (Defendant); KING CITY ENTERTAINMENT INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Minerva Munoz (Defendant); KING CITY ENTERTAINMENT INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
375 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketOrder; Filed by TOWN & COUNTRY INVESTMENTS, LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-10-18 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketApplication for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, etc.; Filed by TOWN & COUNTRY INVESTMENTS, LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketOrder; Filed by TOWN & COUNTRY INVESTMENTS, LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketOrder; Filed by TOWN & COUNTRY INVESTMENTS, LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by TOWN & COUNTRY INVESTMENTS, LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by TOWN & COUNTRY INVESTMENTS, LP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****8132    Hearing Date: August 06, 2020    Dept: O

Hearing on Motion - Other for Order Directing the Los Angeles Sheriff's Department to Release Money Levied Upon Plaintiff/Cross-Defendant Town & Country Investments, L.P;GRANTED. The sheriff’s levy was contrary to the automatic stay on appeal.  Plaintiff is entitled to have the funds seized by the sheriff be returned to plaintiff. Adir Int'l, LLC v. Superior Court, (2013) 216 Cal. App. 4th 996, 998 (undispersed funds wrongfully levied by Sheriff can be returned to judgment debtor).

MP TO SUBMIT PROPOSED ORDER



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COWBOY JOE'S SPORTS SALOON INC is a litigant