This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2021 at 06:59:25 (UTC).

TOWFIGHI NAMIN, FARSHID VS TAVAKOLI, MAHNAZ

Case Summary

On 12/18/2020 TOWFIGHI NAMIN, FARSHID filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against TAVAKOLI, MAHNAZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HOLMES, ROBERT K and ARIAN, LEE S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1993

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HOLMES, ROBERT K

ARIAN, LEE S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TOWFIGHI NAMIN FARSHID

Respondent

TAVAKOLI MAHNAZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

JIMENEZ CECILIA

Respondent Attorney

OKHOVAT AIDIN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2021
  • Hearing09/28/2021 at 8:30 AM in Department F46 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Request for Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • Hearing09/07/2021 at 8:30 AM in Department F46 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Request for Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • Hearing07/19/2021 at 8:30 AM in Department F46 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Restraining Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney (Atty Cecilia Jimenez Sub Out ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney (Atty. Kari Morris Sub Out ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department F46, Arian, Lee S., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketNotice - Limited Scope Representation; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (w/in Existing Case); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less