This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/21/2021 at 05:15:37 (UTC).

TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2018-4, U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE VS MOHAMMED N. HANAFI, TRUSTEE OF THE 5517 OVERLAND DR. IRREVOCABLE LIVING TRUST, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/23/2020 TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2018-4, U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MOHAMMED N HANAFI, TRUSTEE OF THE 5517 OVERLAND DR IRREVOCABLE LIVING TRUST. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5550

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2018-4 U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE

Defendants

HANAFI TRUSTEE OF THE 5517 OVERLAND DR. IRREVOCABLE LIVING TRUST MOHAMMED N.

BOSWELL CHARLES E.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MYERS DAVID A.

Defendant Attorney

ZREIK SAMMY

 

Court Documents

Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment - MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT AND / OR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS

1/29/2021: Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment - MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT AND / OR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Case Management Statement

1/29/2021: Case Management Statement

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

1/29/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT

2/19/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

10/29/2020: Notice of Ruling

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/30/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

9/24/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

9/25/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/9/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Case Management Statement

9/10/2020: Case Management Statement

Answer

9/22/2020: Answer

Notice of Related Case

9/22/2020: Notice of Related Case

Case Management Statement

9/22/2020: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

8/19/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

7/23/2020: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/20/2020

5/20/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/20/2020

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Judgment (CCP 473.5) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department ; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketOpposition (Opposition to Motion to Set aside default); Filed by Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2018-4, U.S. Bank National Association, as Indenture Trustee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketMotion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment (and Quash Service of Summons); Filed by Mohammed N. Hanafi, Trustee of the 5517 Overland Dr. Irrevocable Living Trust (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Mohammed N. Hanafi, Trustee of the 5517 Overland Dr. Irrevocable Living Trust (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2018-4, U.S. Bank National Association, as Indenture Trustee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2018-4, U.S. Bank National Association, as Indenture Trustee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • Docketat 08:34 AM in Department 74; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/20/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2018-4, U.S. Bank National Association, as Indenture Trustee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2018-4, U.S. Bank National Association, as Indenture Trustee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2018-4, U.S. Bank National Association, as Indenture Trustee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MYERS DAVID A. ESQ.