Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2021 at 02:21:10 (UTC).

TORRES, MARTIN - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 04/21/2021 TORRES, MARTIN - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JUAREZ, DANIEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3839

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JUAREZ, DANIEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TORRES JOSHUA M.

Decedent

TORRES MARTIN

Interested Party

BATUN KATIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

PELAEZ GRACE JACQUELINE

Interested Party Attorney

STOLLER LORENZO CARRA

 

Court Documents

Petition - Letters of Administration (Subsequent)

6/2/2021: Petition - Letters of Administration (Subsequent)

Objection - Objection - Appointment of Personal Representative

6/2/2021: Objection - Objection - Appointment of Personal Representative

Request - Special Notice

5/20/2021: Request - Special Notice

Minute Order

5/21/2021: Minute Order

Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

5/14/2021: Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

Supplement - To Clear Probate Notes

5/17/2021: Supplement - To Clear Probate Notes

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

4/29/2021: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

4/22/2021: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

4/21/2021: Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2021
  • Hearing08/05/2021 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 67 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • Hearing08/05/2021 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 67 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketObjection (Objection - Appointment of Personal Representative ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Subsequent); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Decedent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Decedent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketRequest - Special Notice; Filed by Interested Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketSupplement (To Clear Probate Notes ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Publication (Proof of Publication ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate (Notice of Petition to Administer Estate ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STOLLER LORENZO CARRA